Dunbar v. Jepsen
Original Case: 3:19-cv-01163
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-pr-03179 |
Type | prisoner / state / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 02, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 04, 2020 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
George Jepsen
|
|
Defendant
James Duncan
|
|
Defendant
Gilbert Valentine
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Walsh
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Marc Heinmiller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Richard Mahoney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
David Montini
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Shawn Musial
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Stephen Cowf
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Carlos Vasquez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph Pires
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Timolyn Deneen Dunbar, Self-Litigant
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/04/2020 4:31 AM EDT |
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Timolyn Deneen Dunbar, FILED. [2672329] 19-3179 [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:49 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/17/2019, RECEIVED.[2672339] 19-3179 [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:52 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2672345] 19-3179 [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:54 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 MOTION, the right to a new probation hearing trial or for the probation violation to be overturned, on behalf of Appellant Timolyn Deneen Dunbar, FILED. No service date.[2672362] 19-3179 [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:59 AM] |