Barno v. Ficeto
Original Case: 3:18-cv-00202
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03198 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2020 3:45 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Rupal Shah
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Anna Ficeto
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gerard Adelman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jose Suarez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Elizabeth Bozzuto
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
State of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jonathan Barno
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/24/2020 3:34 AM EST |
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Barno, FILED. [2673279] 19-3198 [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:47 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 84 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 06/28/2019, RECEIVED.[2673291] 19-3198 [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:50 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/09/2019, RECEIVED.[2673298] 19-3198 [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:51 PM] | |
4 | 4 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/19/2019, RECEIVED.[2673306] 19-3198 [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:52 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2673339] 19-3198 [Entered: 10/04/2019 05:12 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |