Dollinger v. New York State Insurance Fund
Original Case: 3:14-cv-00908
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03211 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 07, 2020 3:26 AM EST |
Defendant
Heather Woolfolk
|
|
Defendant
Mark Gallo
|
|
Defendant
Robert Verhayden
|
|
Defendant
Tina Christiano
|
|
Defendant
Thomas Racko
|
|
Defendant
Joe Nolte
|
|
Defendant
John Massetti
|
|
Defendant
Susan Lefkowitz
|
|
Defendant
Alyce Siegel
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Mullen
|
|
Defendant
Mark Kenyon
|
|
Defendant
Scott Englehart, AKA Scott Anglehart
|
|
Defendant
Charles Browning
|
|
Defendant
James Fehrer
|
|
Defendant
Peter Cusick
|
|
Defendant
William O'Brien
|
|
Defendant
NYSIF Board of Commissioners
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Insurance Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert A. Dollinger
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/07/2020 3:24 AM EST |
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Robert A. Dollinger, FILED. [2674039] 19-3211 [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:00 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 48 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 20 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 09/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2674043] 19-3211 [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:02 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2674046] 19-3211 [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:02 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2674049] 19-3211 [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:03 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 26 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |