Saraceni v. M&T Bank Corporation
Original Case: 1:19-cv-01152
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03189 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2019 3:34 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
M&T Bank Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Christine Saraceni
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/06/2019 3:29 AM EST |
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Christine Saraceni, FILED. [2672827] 19-3189 --[Edited 10/04/2019 by TT] [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:56 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Christine Saraceni, district court receipt # 02093610249, FILED.[2672829] 19-3189 [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:58 PM] | |
3 | 3 5 pgs DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 09/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2672835] 19-3189 [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:01 PM] |