Pimentel v. Ricotta & Marks, P.C.
Original Case: 1:19-cv-07437
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03196 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 20, 2020 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Ricotta & Marks, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nicholas Pimentel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nicholas Pimentel, AKA Aasir Azzarmi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/20/2020 4:33 AM EDT |
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Nicholas Pimentel, FILED. [2673148] 19-3196 [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:08 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 4 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2675868] 19-3196 [Entered: 10/09/2019 08:38 AM] | |
3 | 3 6 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 09/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2675872] 19-3196 [Entered: 10/09/2019 08:40 AM] | |
4 | 4 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2675879] 19-3196 [Entered: 10/09/2019 08:42 AM] | |
5 | 5 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Nicholas Pimentel, FILED. Service date 10/01/2019 by US mail.[2675882] 19-3196 [Entered: 10/09/2019 08:45 AM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2675887] 19-3196 [Entered: 10/09/2019 08:48 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |