du Quenoy v. American University of Beirut, et al
Original Case: 1:18-cv-06962
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03182 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 06, 2020 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
American University of Beirut
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Fadlo Khuri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Trudi Hodges
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Paul du Quenoy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/06/2020 4:30 AM EDT |
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Paul du Quenoy, FILED. [2673777] 19-3182 [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:10 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 18 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2673787] 19-3182 [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:14 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT CLERK'S JUDGMENT, dated 09/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2673792] 19-3182 [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:15 AM] | |
4 | 4 1 pgs PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Paul du Quenoy, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17715278, FILED.[2673796] 19-3182 [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:17 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2673798] 19-3182 [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:17 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |