Padilla Raudales v. Decker
Original Case: 1:19-cv-01934
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-pr-03220 |
Type | prisoner / federal / habeas corpus |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 20, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2020 1:43 PM EST |
Petitioner - Appellee
Jose Celan Padilla Raudales
|
Represented By
|
Respondent - Appellant
Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, New York City Field Office, United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement
|
Represented By
Brandon Matthew Waterman
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New contact info |
Respondent - Appellant
Kevin McAleenan, in his official capacity as Acting United States Secretary of Homeland Security
|
|
Respondent - Appellant
Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity as Acting United States Secretary of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
Brandon Matthew Waterman
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New contact info |
Respondent - Appellant
William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General, United States Department of Justice
|
Represented By
Brandon Matthew Waterman
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New contact info |
Docket last updated: 02/15/2020 1:43 PM EST |
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Kirstjen M. Nielsen, FILED. [2674805] 19-3220 [Entered: 10/08/2019 09:12 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2674808] 19-3220 [Entered: 10/08/2019 09:15 AM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2674812] 19-3220 [Entered: 10/08/2019 09:15 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |