Weaver v. Indymac Federal Bank, FSB
Original Case: 1:09-cv-05091
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03242 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 05, 2020 3:28 AM EST |
Defendant
Indymac Federal Bank, FSB, FKA Indymac Bank, FSB, OneWest Bank
|
|
Defendant
Houlihan Lawrence Real Estate, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Joan Davies
|
|
Defendant
John Oliveira
|
|
Defendant
Clove Branch Road, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kevin P. Barry, Attorney at Law
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
OneWest Bank, FSB, FKA Indymac Federal Bank, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Erica Johnson-Seck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Everette Weaver
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/05/2020 3:26 AM EST |
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Everette Weaver, FILED. [2675978] 19-3242 [Entered: 10/09/2019 09:31 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 21 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 09/09/2019, RECEIVED.[2675999] 19-3242 [Entered: 10/09/2019 09:42 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Everette Weaver, district court receipt # 465401245519, FILED.[2676005] 19-3242 [Entered: 10/09/2019 09:46 AM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2676035] 19-3242 [Entered: 10/09/2019 10:02 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 21 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |