United States of America v. Gales
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cr-03250 |
Type | criminal / post-conviction |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10/28/2019 3:08 AM EDT |
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CRIMINAL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Dupree Gales, FILED. [2676216] 19-3250 [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:57 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Criminal_Docketing_Notice | ||
Att: 2 15 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 6 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2676228] 19-3250 [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:04 PM] | |
8 | 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2678315] 19-3250 [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:59 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 15 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |