Jacubovich v. State of Israel, et al
Original Case: 1:18-cv-03326
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-02970 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 28, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday May 30, 2020 4:26 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
State of Israel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Computershare Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Computershare Trust Company, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nicole Sofia Jacubovich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Calanit Diva Jacubovich
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2020 4:24 AM EDT |
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Calanit Diva Jacubovich and Nicole Sofia Jacubovich, FILED. [2677320] 19-2970 [Entered: 10/10/2019 01:54 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 16 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 09/09/2019, RECEIVED.[2677322] 19-2970 [Entered: 10/10/2019 01:56 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT CLERK'S JUDGMENT, dated 09/11/2019, RECEIVED.[2677324] 19-2970 [Entered: 10/10/2019 01:57 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Calanit Diva Jacubovich and Nicole Sofia Jacubovich, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17736470, FILED.[2677325] 19-2970 [Entered: 10/10/2019 01:57 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2677326] 19-2970 [Entered: 10/10/2019 01:59 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |