Conquistador v. Zweibelson
Original Case: 3:17-cv-00132
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-pr-03267 |
Type | prisoner / state / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2019 4:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kim Bermudez, Individual and Official Capacity
|
|
Defendant
Police Officer, 1, Individual and Official Capacity
|
|
Defendant
City of Hartford
|
|
Defendant
Hartford Police Department
|
|
Defendant
State of Connecticut
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Zweibelson, Police Officer, Individual and Official Capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gashi, Police Officer, Individual and Official Capacity
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jean K. Conquistador
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/12/2019 4:17 AM EDT |
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jean K. Conquistador, FILED. [2677054] 19-3267 [Entered: 10/10/2019 11:17 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2677090] 19-3267 [Entered: 10/10/2019 11:31 AM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2677094] 19-3267 [Entered: 10/10/2019 11:32 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 31 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
4 | 4 1 pgs AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2677107] 19-3267 [Entered: 10/10/2019 11:37 AM] |