National Air Cargo Group, Inc. v. Maersk Line, Limited
Original Case: 1:17-cv-08659
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03254 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 21, 2019 3:36 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Maersk Line, Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Maersk Line A/S
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
A/P Moeller Maersk, "AP"
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Air Cargo Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/21/2019 3:33 AM EST |
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant National Air Cargo Group, Inc., FILED. [2676258] 19-3254 [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:20 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2676263] 19-3254 [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:22 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2676267] 19-3254 [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:23 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2676269] 19-3254 [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:23 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant National Air Cargo Group, Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-17730977, FILED.[2676275] 19-3254 [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:25 PM] |