Better Housing for Long Beach et al v. City of Long Beach et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-08861 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 12, 2020 4:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Gavin Newsom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Better Housing for Long Beach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joani Weir
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
City of Long Beach
Terminated: 01/31/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Monday, July 18, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 07/18 1:51 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order36 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals31 , CCA # 20-55373 The judgment of this Court, entered June 24, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (car) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 06/27 9:58 AM
MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals31 filed by Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir. CCA # 20-55373 AFFIRMED. (twdb) |
|
Friday, July 03, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Fri 07/03 5:32 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/9/2020 at 1:29 p.m. re Transcript34 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dhs) |
|
34 | 34
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 07/03 5:31 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/9/2020 at 1:29 p.m. ****Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE HINO-SPAAN at: WEBSITE www.debbiehinospaan.com; E-mail, dhinospaan@yahoo.com before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Additional formats of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available to be purchased at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.** Redaction Request due 7/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2020. (dhs) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Thu 04/09 11:12 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55373 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals31 as to Plaintiff Better Housing for Long Beach. (iv) |
|
32 | 32
transcript
-Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Thu 04/09 10:11 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 20-55373 as to Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir for Court Reporter. Court will contact Paul Beard II at paul.beard@fisherbroyles.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Beard, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Wed 04/08 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir. Appeal of Judgment30 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26017970.) (Beard, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 03/11 3:08 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Governor's motion is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv) |
|
29 | 29
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 03/11 3:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING GOVERNOR NEWSOM'S MOTION TO DISMISS12 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Governor's motion to dismiss is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' claims against the Governor are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Because the Governor is the sole remaining Defendant, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (iv) |
|
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 03/09 4:09 PM
MINUTES OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT12 held before Judge Cormac J. Carney. Motion hearing held. The Court hears oral argument from the parties. The Court takes the Motion under submission. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (iv) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 02/24 5:39 PM
ORDER TO CONTINUE ISSUANCE OF SCHEDULING ORDER PURSUANT TO FRCP 16(B)26 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Issuance of a Scheduling Order is continued until thirty (30) days following the Court's decision on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (iv) |
|
26 | 26
stip
Continue
Mon 02/24 7:32 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Order from March 5, 2020 to After a Decision on the Motion to Dismiss Re: Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only16 filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir.(Beard, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 01/31 5:31 PM
ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(A)(1)(A)(II)23 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant City of Long Beach are dismissed with prejudice. (iv) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 01/31 4:19 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plainitffs' Complaint 12 filed by Defendant Gavin Newsom. (Wise, R) |
|
23 | 23
stip
Dismiss Party
Fri 01/31 10:11 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant City of Long Beach filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir.(Beard, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order To Dismiss Defendant City of Long Beach | ||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/23 3:45 PM
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S REQUEST TO WITHDRAW JURY DEMAND21 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant CITY OF LONG BEACH'S request to withdraw its jury demand is GRANTED. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 01/22 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Stipulation Re Consent for Defendant, City of Long Beach to Withdraw Jury Demand re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)13(Russell, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation, | ||
Att: 2 Request, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, January 18, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
24
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Sat 01/18 2:13 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plainitffs' Complaint 12 filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir.(Beard, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 01/16 11:07 AM
ORDER18 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiffs' Opposition Brief: January 17, 2020. Defendant' Reply Brief: January 31, 2020. Hearing on Motion To Dismiss: March 9, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. (iv) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 01/13 9:50 PM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply Briefs as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plainitffs' Complaint 12 filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir.(Beard, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/17 9:38 AM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO MOVE TO STRIKE DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S ANSWER15 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The time for Plaintiffs to file a motion to strike the City's Answer is hereby extended by 28 days, so that the new due date for any such motion shall be January 24, 2020. (iv) |
|
16 | 16
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 12/16 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on March 5, 2020. (gga) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 12/13 9:33 AM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion To Strike Answer filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir.(Beard, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 12/06 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Long Beach, identifying City of Long Beach. (Russell, Howard) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 12/06 3:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant City of Long Beach.(Attorney Howard Darryl Russell added to party City of Long Beach(pty:dft))(Russell, Howard) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Case Dismiss (cause or other)
Fri 12/06 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plainitffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Gavin Newsom. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Wise, R) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/13 1:08 PM
ORDER10 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. December 6, 2019: Defendants to file any motions to dismiss. January 10, 2020: Plaintiffs to file opposition to any motions to dismiss. January 22, 2020: Defendants to file replies in support of any motions to dismiss. February 10, 2020: Hearing on any motions to dismiss. (iv) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 11/07 1:48 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Gavin Newsom answer now due 12/6/2019, filed by defendant Gavin Newsom.(Attorney R Matthew Wise added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft))(Wise, R) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 10/15 5:56 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Gavin Newsom. (esa) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 10/15 5:54 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant City of Long Beach. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 10/15 5:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 10/15 5:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 10/15 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir, (Attorney Paul J Beard, II added to party Joani Weir(pty:pla))(Beard, Paul) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 10/15 4:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir. (Beard, Paul) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 10/15 4:31 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir. (Beard, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 10/15 4:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach, Joani Weir. (Beard, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 10/15 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24608759 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Better Housing for Long Beach. (Attorney Paul J Beard, II added to party Better Housing for Long Beach(pty:pla))(Beard, Paul) |