Member Case
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-06741

Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Randal S Mashburn
Case #: 3:19-bk-06736
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2019
Terminated:Dec 12, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
NAMP, LLC
1780 Pond Run
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2752
Represented By
WILLIAM L NORTON, III
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, December 12, 2019
11 11 order Final Decree Chapter 11 Thu 12/12 9:16 AM
Final Decree Issued. Chapter 11 case is closed. IT IS ORDERED that the trustee, if one was appointed, is discharged as trustee of this estate. Signed on 12/12/2019. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
10 10 utility Public Remark (No NEF) Fri 11/08 1:29 PM
Remark - This case was transferred to Delaware Bankruptcy Court and it was assigned case # 19-12370 (tms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 10/24 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 10/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
7 7 utility Public Remark (NEF) Tue 10/22 7:37 AM
Remark An order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Dura Automotive Systems, LLC; Dura Automotive Systems Cable Operations, LLC; Dura Fremont L.L.C.; Dura G.P.; Dura Mexico Holdings, LLC; Dura Operating, LLC; and NAMP, LLC. All further pleadings, claims, and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 19-06741 (RSM). Related [+] (jmw)
Related: [-] 5 Order
Monday, October 21, 2019
6 6 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Mon 10/21 2:46 PM
Meeting of Creditors Meeting of Creditors to be held on 11/22/2019 at 10:00 AM at Customs House, 701 Broadway, Room 100, Nashville, TN 37203. (US TRUSTEE)
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs order Order Mon 10/21 12:31 PM
Order Granting Debtors' Expedited Motion for Joint Administration on Lead Case 19-06741 with Member Case 19-06736 (See DE 120 in Lead Case). Signed on 10/21/2019. (ko)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 19, 2019
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Notice Mon 10/21 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 10/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Expedited Hearing
Thursday, October 17, 2019
3 3 order Expedite Hearing Thu 10/17 12:42 PM
Order Setting Expedited Hearing on First Day Motions (See #17 in Case # 19-6741 Hearing scheduled 10/18/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Signed on 10/17/2019. (jlm)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Payment Thu 10/17 1:34 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(3:19-bk-06736) [misc,volp11] (1717.00). Receipt number 15857765. Fee amount $ 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 24 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 10/17 1:31 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount is $1717.00. (NORTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned Thu 10/17 9:00 AM
Judge Randal Mashburn added to case. Involvement of Judge Charles M Walker Terminated Related [+] (jlm)
Related: [-] 19-6735