Intel Corporation v. Fortress Investment Group LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Case #: | 5:19-cv-06856 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Oct 21, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 18, 2020 3:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
DSS Technology Management, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Fortress Investment Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VLSI Technology LLC
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fortress Credit Co LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Intel Corporation
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 18 2019
ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/13/2019. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019) |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Relate Case
Mon 12/02 12:23 PM
Order denying 37 Motion to Relate Case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on December 2, 2019.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 12/02 11:37 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:37 Notice (Other), filed by Intel Corporation (cv, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 11/22 12:33 PM
NOTICE by Fortress Credit Co LLC, Fortress Investment Group LLC, VLSI Technology LLC Notice of Defendants' Response in Support of Intel's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related(Ashley, Alvin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 11/21 3:07 PM
NOTICE by Intel Corporation Notice Of Intel Corporation's Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Case 19-cv-07651-LB Should Be Related(Selwyn, Mark) Modified on 11/21/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 11/20 4:58 PM
ORDER APPROVAL re 35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Intel Corporation. All deadlines/hearings are terminated. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE FILE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/20/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 11/20 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, by Intel Corporation (Selwyn, Mark) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/18 11:12 AM
ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/13/2019. (tshS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
5
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 11/15 1:37 PM
Order granting 32 Stipulation *MODIFIED*. In the event a motion is filed, the movant shall notice the motion for hearing on April 2, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/15/2019(ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 11/15 10:11 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines to Respond to the Complaint and Set Motions to Dismiss, Strike and/or Stay the Action Briefing Schedule filed by Fortress Credit Co LLC, Fortress Investment Group LLC, VLSI Technology LLC.(Ashley, Alvin) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of A. Matthew Ashley | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 11/15 2:42 PM
***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF33 Order: Responses due by 2/20/2020. Replies due by 3/9/2020. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 11/13 10:17 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation - Summons In A Civil Action Served Upon DSS Technology Management, Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) |
|
30 | 30
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 11/13 10:15 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation - Summons In A Civil Action Served Upon VLSI Technology LLC (Selwyn, Mark) |
|
29 | 29
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 11/13 10:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation - Summons In A Civil Action Served Upon Fortress Credit Co. LLC (Selwyn, Mark) |
|
28 | 28
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 11/13 10:12 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation - Summons In A Civil Action Served Upon Fortress Investment Group LLC (Selwyn, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/12 7:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Lauren Weber (Weber, Olivia) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/12 6:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Hattenbach (Hattenbach, Benjamin) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/12 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Chu (Chu, Morgan) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 11/12 5:17 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by VLSI Technology LLC identifying Corporate Parent CF VLSI Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate NXP B.V., Other Affiliate Michael Stolarski for VLSI Technology LLC. (Harbour, Michael) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 11/12 5:13 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Fortress Credit Co LLC identifying Corporate Parent Drawbridge Special Opportunities Fund LP for Fortress Credit Co LLC. (Harbour, Michael) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 11/12 5:11 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Fortress Investment Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate MIC FH Aggregator LP for Fortress Investment Group LLC. (Harbour, Michael) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 11/12 7:17 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Fortress Credit Co LLC, Fortress Investment Group LLC, VLSI Technology LLC.(Ashley, Alvin) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of A. Matthew Ashley, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to the Ashley Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/06 7:51 AM
ORDER Granting 11 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Timothy D. Syrett, Counsel for Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/06 7:43 AM
ORDER Granting 10 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Amanda L. Major, Counsel for Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/06 7:42 AM
ORDER Granting 9 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Joseph J. Mueller, Counsel for Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/06 7:40 AM
ORDER Granting 8 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Leon B. Greenfield, Counsel for Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/06 7:39 AM
ORDER Granting 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William F. Lee, Counsel for Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 11/05 6:48 PM
(Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 11/05 3:14 PM
ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/5/19.(haS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 11/05 10:09 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 10/22 4:40 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 10/21 6:08 PM
Proposed Summons.(Selwyn, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 10/21 6:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intel Corporation (Selwyn, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
48
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/21 5:59 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13812113.). Filed byIntel Corporation.(Selwyn, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |