Raul Julia Levy v. The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (CIS) et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:12-cv-03430 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1451(a) Revoke Citizenship |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2012 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 10, 2016 11:31 PM PST |
Defendant
Nancy Alby
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric Holder, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janet Napolitano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (CIS)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raul Julia Levy
5003 Medina Road
Woodland Hills, CA 91364 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
60 | 60
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 11/20 8:16 AM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Joint Stipulation59 . Plaintiff's complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court further ORDERS that each side will bear its own costs and expenses. The final pretrial conference on 12/15/2015 and the trial on 1/19/2016 are hereby VACATED. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) |
|
59 | 59
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 11/19 1:01 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 filed by Defendants Nancy Alby, Eric Holder, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Napolitano, The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (CIS).(Hildebrand, Regan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 17, 2015 | ||
58 | 58
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 11/17 9:10 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT OF COURT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Raul Julia Levy will appear in the United States District Court, 255 E. Temple St., Los Angeles, California, in Courtroom 550 5th Floor, on Monday, November 23, 2015, at 9:30 a.m., to show cause why he should not be found in contempt of court for failure to obey the Courts previous order. See 18 U.S.C. §§ 401,402; 28 U.S.C. § 636. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
57 | 57
misc
Status Report
Mon 11/16 6:42 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Nancy Alby, Eric Holder, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Napolitano, The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (CIS). (Hildebrand, Regan) |