Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56884 - The Ohio Valley Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56886 - AMCA Coal Leasing, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56887 - Central Ohio Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56888 - Murray American Coal, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56889 - AmCoal Holdings, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56890 - Coal Resources Holdings Co.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56891 - Murray American Energy, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56892 - Coal Resources, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56893 - American Compliance Coal, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56894 - Consolidated Land Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56895 - The American Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56896 - Murray American Kentucky Towing, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56897 - American Energy Corporation
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56898 - Consolidation Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56899 - The American Coal Sales Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56900 - Murray American Minerals, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56901 - American Equipment & Machine, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56902 - Corporate Aviation Services, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56903 - American Mine Services, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56904 - Eighty-Four Mining Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56905 - The Franklin County Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56906 - Murray American Resources, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56907 - American Natural Gas, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56908 - Empire Dock, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56909 - The Harrison County Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56910 - Murray American River Towing, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56911 - Energy Resources, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56912 - AmericanHocking Energy, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56913 - The Marion County Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56914 - Murray American Transportation, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56915 - Energy Transportation, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56916 - AmericanMountaineer Energy, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56917 - The Marshall County Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56918 - Murray Colombian Resources, LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56919 - Genwal Resources, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56920 - AmericanMountaineer Properties, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56921 - The McLean County Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56922 - Kanawha Transportation Center, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56923 - The Meigs County Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56924 - Murray Equipment & Machine, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56925 - Anchor Longwall and Rebuild, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56926 - KenAmerican Resources, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56927 - The Monongalia County Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56928 - Murray Kentucky Energy Services, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56929 - Andalex Resources Management, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56930 - Keystone Coal Mining Corporation
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56931 - The Muhlenberg County Coal Company, LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56932 - Andalex Resources, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56933 - Murray Kentucky Energy, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56934 - The Muskingum County Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56935 - Maple Creek Mining, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56936 - Avonmore Rail Loading, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56937 - The Ohio County Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56938 - Maple Creek Processing, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56939 - Murray Keystone Processing, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56940 - Belmont Coal, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56941 - The Ohio Valley Transloading Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56942 - McElroy Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56943 - The Oklahoma Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56944 - Murray South America, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56945 - Belmont County Broadcast Studio, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56946 - Mill Creek Mining Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56947 - The Washington County Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56948 - Mon River Towing, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56949 - Canterbury Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56950 - Murray Utah Energy Services, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56951 - The Western Kentucky Coal Company, LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56952 - MonValley Transportation Center, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56953 - CCC Land Resources LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56954 - Twin Rivers Towing Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56955 - Ohio Energy Transportation, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56956 - CCC RCPC LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56957 - UMCO Energy, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56958 - Ohio Valley Resources, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56959 - UtahAmerican Energy, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56960 - West Ridge Resources, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56961 - OhioAmerican Energy, Incorporated
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56962 - West Virginia Resources, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56963 - Western Kentucky Coal Resources, LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56964 - Oneida Coal Company, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56965 - Western Kentucky Consolidated Resources, LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56966 - Western Kentucky Land Holding, LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56967 - PennAmerican Coal L.P.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56968 - Western Kentucky Rail Loadout, LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56969 - Western Kentucky Resources Financing, LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56970 - PennAmerican Coal, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56971 - Western Kentucky Resources, LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56972 - Western Kentucky River Loadout, LLC
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56973 - Pennsylvania Transloading, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56974 - Southern Ohio Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56975 - Pinski Corp.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56976 - Spring Church Coal Company
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56977 - Sunburst Resources, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56978 - Pleasant Farms, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56979 - T D K Coal Sales, Incorporated
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56980 - Premium Coal, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-56981 - Murray Global Commodities, Inc.
|
10/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
2:19-bk-57017 - Murray Energy Corporation
|
10/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:19-ap-02143 - Black Diamond Commercial Finance, L.L.C. v. Murray Energy Corporation et al
|
11/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
2:20-ap-02021 - Rider et al v. The American Coal Company et al
|
03/06/2020
|
Adversary
|
2:20-ap-02036 - CONSOL Energy Inc. v. Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al.
|
04/22/2020
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-02033 - Gulfport Appalachia, LLC et al v. American Consolidated Natural Resources et al
|
02/10/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-02053 - Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. v. Earth Support Services, Inc.
|
10/27/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-02054 - Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. v. GMS Mine Repair and Maintenance, Inc.
|
10/27/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-02055 - Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. v. Greer Industries, Inc.
|
10/27/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:21-ap-02056 - Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. v. Jabo Supply Corporation
|
10/27/2021
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-02007 - Murray et al v. Willkie Farr & Gallagher et al
|
03/07/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-02041 - Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. v. H.I. Quality Steel Castings Limited
|
11/21/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:22-ap-02042 - Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al. v. United Central Industrial Supply Company, L.L.C.
|
11/21/2022
|
Adversary
|
2:23-ap-02006 - American Consolidated Natural Resources, Inc. v. The Brennan Group, LLC
|
01/20/2023
|