J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited v. PlasMet, LLP et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Orinda D Evans |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00824 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 12:33 PM EST |
Defendant
NP Recycling, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PlasMet, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Thu 10/15 2:39 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP. (Gerakitis, Richard) |
|
Friday, July 17, 2015 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order on Motion for Judgment
Mon 07/20 1:26 PM
FINAL CONSENT JUDGMENT. Plaintiff is hereby awarded a judgment against Defendant PlasMet, LLP in the amount of $95,752.00, the amount of the Original Judgment, together with post-judgment interest under 28 U.S.C. § 1961 (a) for a period through and including August 31, 2015 (the Replacement Judgment). The Replacement Judgment supersedes and replaces the Original Judgment. Defendant PlasMet, LLP shall pay the full amount of the Replacement Judgment in two payments of $47,876.00 due on July 31 and August 31, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Final Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 07/16/15. (fap) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 07/20 1:29 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (fap) |
||
Thursday, July 16, 2015 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Judgment
Thu 07/16 11:21 AM
Joint MOTION for Judgment with Brief In Support by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP. (Gerakitis, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 07/15 3:05 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/27/15, 7/28/15, 7/29/15, 7/30/15, 7/31/15, 8/1/15, 8/2/15, 8/3/15, 8/4/15, 8/5/15, 8/6/15, 8/7/15,8/8/15, 8/9/15, by George William Long, III. (Long, George) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/07 11:48 AM
NOTICE by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited re38 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, (Ebbs, Arthur) |
|
Tuesday, June 16, 2015 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 06/17 1:56 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant, PlasMet, LLP for damages on Count II in the amount of $95,699.23. (fap) |
|
38 | 38
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Wed 06/17 1:39 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part31 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the foregoing reasons. Plaintiff J&D's Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendant PlasMet31 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED as to Count II for damages, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to award judgment against PlasMet and in favor of J&D in the amount of $95,699.23. As to Count I for specific performance, the motion is DENIED as moot. The parties are DIRECTED to file a notice regarding the status of the remaining Defendants--NP Recyling, LLC; Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC; and Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC--within twenty (20) days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 06/16/15. (fap) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Response to Statement of Material Facts
Mon 03/16 3:30 PM
Response to Statement of Material Facts re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant PlasMet, LLP Response to Defendant PlasMet, LLP's Statement of Additional Material Facts filed by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited. (Ebbs, Arthur) |
|
36 | 36
respm
Reply Brief
Mon 03/16 3:28 PM
REPLY BRIEF re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant PlasMet, LLP filed by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited. (Ebbs, Arthur) |
|
Tuesday, February 24, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 02/25 8:50 AM
ORDER granting34 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to file a reply brief re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment up through and including March 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 02/24/15. (fap) |
|
Friday, February 20, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 02/20 10:24 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time re:31 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant PlasMet, LLP for Plaintiff to File Summary Judgment Reply Brief by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited, NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP.(Ebbs, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Fri 02/20 8:29 AM
Submission of31 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Defendant PlasMet, LLP, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (fap) |
||
Friday, February 13, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 02/13 4:26 PM
RESPONSE re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant PlasMet, LLP Defendant PlasMet, LLP filed by PlasMet, LLP.(Schwedler, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Statement of Additional Material Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Rhett Shirley | ||
Tuesday, January 20, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Affidavit
Tue 01/20 3:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant PlasMet, LLP Declaration of Alice Huang by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited.(Ebbs, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - February 15, 2011 Email, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - February 22, 2011 Email Thread, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Purchase Confirmations, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C-1 - July 8, 2011 Emails, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Shipping Documents for Four Containers, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Invoices for Two Containers, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Invoices for Two Containers, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Shipping Documents for Six Containers, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Invoices for Six Containers, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Shipping Documents for Nine Containers, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Invoices for Nine Containers, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K - October 12, 2011 Email Thread, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L - November 7, 2011 Email Thread, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M - December 8, 2011 Email, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N - January 5, 2012 Email Thread, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit O - Purchase Confirmation 20120105A, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit P - Shipping Documents for Nine Containers, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Q - Invoices for Nine Containers, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit R - February 13 to 23, 2012 Email Thread, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit S - 2013 Email Thread | ||
31 | 31
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 01/20 3:21 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant PlasMet, LLP with Brief In Support by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited.(Ebbs, Arthur) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Interrogatory Answers, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Shirley Biographies | ||
Wednesday, October 22, 2014 | ||
30 | 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited.(Ebbs, Arthur) | |
29 | 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Continuing Interrogatories by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited.(Ebbs, Arthur) | |
Tuesday, October 14, 2014 | ||
28 | 28 ORDER granting27 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery period is hereby extended through and including December 19, 2014. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 10/14/14. (fap) | |
Thursday, October 09, 2014 | ||
27 | 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP. (Gerakitis, Richard) | |
Monday, September 29, 2014 | ||
26 | 26 ORDER granting25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary Daniel Knopf terminated. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 09/26/14. (fap) | |
Monday, September 22, 2014 | ||
25 | 25 MOTION to Withdraw Gary Daniel Knopf as Attorneyby NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP. (Knopf, Gary) | |
Friday, September 12, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP.(Schwedler, Patrick) | |
23 | 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendants' First Interrogatories to Plaintiff by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP.(Schwedler, Patrick) | |
Monday, September 08, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick James Schwedler on behalf of NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP (Schwedler, Patrick) | |
Wednesday, July 30, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP for Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Continuing Interrogatories (Knopf, Gary) | |
20 | 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP for Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production (Knopf, Gary) | |
19 | 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP for Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests to Admit (Knopf, Gary) | |
Friday, June 27, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's 1st Continuing Interrogatories and Request for Production to Defendants by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited.(Ebbs, Arthur) | |
17 | 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Requests to Admit by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited.(Ebbs, Arthur) | |
Monday, June 23, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 SCHEDULING ORDER approving13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 7/20/14. (ddm) | |
Wednesday, June 18, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 Initial Disclosures by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP.(Knopf, Gary) | |
14 | 14 Initial Disclosures by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited.(Ebbs, Arthur) | |
13 | 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited, NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP. (Ebbs, Arthur) | |
Wednesday, May 21, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/26/14, 7/27/14, 7/28/14, 7/29/14, 7/30/14, 7/31/14, 8/1/14, 8/2/14, by George William Long, III. (Long, George) | |
Monday, May 19, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP. Discovery ends on 10/16/2014.(Gerakitis, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. | |
Tuesday, May 06, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to respond re1 Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within which Defendants may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including May 19, 2014. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 05/06/14. (fap) | |
Monday, May 05, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP.(Knopf, Gary) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 28, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer1 Complaint up to and including May 5, 2014. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 04/28/14. (fap) | |
Friday, April 25, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC, PlasMet, LLP.(Knopf, Gary) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 14, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to1 Complaint up to and through April 25, 2014. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 04/14/14. (fap) | |
Friday, April 11, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by PlasMet, LLP.(Knopf, Gary) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order | ||
Friday, March 28, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Return of Service Executed on 3/26/2014 by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited. All Defendants. Answer due 4/16/2014.(Ebbs, Arthur) Modified to add executed and answer date on 3/31/2014 (bdb). | |
Att: 1 Return of Serv-ce - NP Recycling, | ||
Att: 2 Return of Service - Newell Recycling Savannah, | ||
Att: 3 Return of Service - Newell Recycling Gwinnett | ||
Tuesday, March 25, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited. (Ebbs, Arthur) | |
Monday, March 24, 2014 | ||
Submission of1 Complaint for Review. Submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb) | ||
Friday, March 21, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to PlasMet, LLP, NP Recycling, LLC, Newell Recycling of Gwinnett, LLC, Newell Recycling of Savannah, LLC (bdb) | |
Att: 1 NP Recycling LLC, | ||
Att: 2 Newell Recycling of Savannah LLC, | ||
Att: 3 Newell Recycling of Gwinnett LLC | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Enforcement of Settlement Agreement with Jury Demand filed by J&D International Trading Company (Hong Kong) Limited. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-5089176.)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet |