INSTITUTIONAL SHAREHOLDER SERVICES INC. v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-03275 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 28, 2020 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
WALTER JOSEPH CLAYTON, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
INSTITUTIONAL SHAREHOLDER SERVICES INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
73 | 73
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 04/16 12:39 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re72 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (mg) |
|
72 | 72
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Tue 04/16 12:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to70 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,69 Order, by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ADCDC-10831079. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Hughes, Paul) |
|
71 | 71
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Whitfield Hughes, III on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS (Hughes, Paul) |