Zidware, Inc.
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Carol A Doyle |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-33204 |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2019 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2020 |
Debtor
Zidware, Inc.
722 Chestnut Court
Bartlett, IL 60103 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Catherine L. Steege, ESQ
Jenner & Block 353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 11/22/2019 12:02 AM CST |
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)
Thu 11/21 5:13 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $335, Filed by Jeffrey C Dan on behalf of Zidware, Inc. (Dan, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 11/21 5:15 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 19-33204 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 41053492. Fee Amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Thu 11/21 5:19 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/14/2020 at 02:00 PM at 219 South Dearborn, Office of the U.S. Trustee, 8th Floor, Room 800, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Dan, Jeffrey) |