Reaves v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurie J Michelson |
Referred: | Mona K Majzoub |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-11258 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 27, 2016 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 11, 2014 7:07 PM EST |
Defendant
Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE J. REAVES
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 26 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
45 | 45
order
Judgment*
Fri 05/27 12:34 PM
JUDGMENT - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
43 | 43
trial
Jury Verdict Form
Thu 05/26 5:15 PM
Jury Verdict Form (JJoh) |
|
42 | 42
trial
Jury Instructions
Thu 05/26 5:12 PM
FINAL Jury Instructions (JJoh) |
|
41 | 41
order
Pretrial Order - Joint Final
Thu 05/26 5:05 PM
JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
|
minutes
Jury Trial
Thu 05/26 4:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Jury Trial Held and Completed on 5/26/2016. Jury Deliberation also held and JURY VERDICT REACHED. (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (JJoh) |
||
order
Text-Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 05/26 5:20 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Denying as moot 40 MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
||
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Directed Verdict
Mon 05/23 3:35 PM
(ORAL) MOTION for Directed Verdict - by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (JJoh) |
|
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 05/23 3:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Motion Hearing held on 5/23/2016 re 40 MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (JJoh) |
||
minutes
Jury Trial
Mon 05/23 3:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 5/23/2016. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2016 09:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (JJoh) |
||
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
minutes
Jury Trial
Fri 05/20 4:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 5/20/2016. Jury Trial set for 5/23/2016 08:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson . (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (JJoh) |
||
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
minutes
Jury Trial
Thu 05/19 2:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 5/19/2016. Jury Trial set for 5/20/2016 08:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (JJoh) |
||
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
minutes
Jury Trial
Thu 05/19 8:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 5/18/2016. Jury Trial set for 5/19/2016 08:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (JJoh) |
||
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
minutes
Voir Dire
Tue 05/17 4:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Voir Dire Begun and Concluded and Jury Impaneled on 5/17/2016. (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (JJoh) |
||
minutes
Jury Trial
Tue 05/17 4:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Jury Trial Begun and Continued on 5/17/2016. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2016 08:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (JJoh) |
||
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
order
Text-Only Order
Mon 04/11 1:39 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: In both the November 9, 2015 final pretrial conference and the December 21, 2015 trial scheduling order (Dkt. 33), the Court requested from the parties revised joint proposed jury instructions. To date, the parties still have not complied with this request. The parties have until April 29, 2016 to submit proposed jury instructions that meet the Court's case management requirements. Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
||
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
order
Text-Only Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/21 11:44 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Jury Selection/Trial set for 5/17/2016 08:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson - Entered by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
||
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 03/16 1:53 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Unavailability (Counard, Allen) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
order
Text-Only Order
Wed 03/02 9:25 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting38 Emergency MOTION to Adjourn filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The Court will issue a revised trial schedule. Entered by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
||
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Adjourn
Tue 03/01 12:38 PM
Emergency MOTION to Adjourn Text-Only Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Three Weeks by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Griffin, Shelly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, February 12, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
trial
Proposed Voir Dire
Fri 02/12 4:42 PM
Proposed Voir Dire by All Plaintiffs (Counard, Allen) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Statement - free
Fri 02/12 11:45 AM
Joint STATEMENT of Case by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Griffin, Shelly) |
|
35 | 35
trial
Exhibit List
Fri 02/12 11:40 AM
Exhibit List by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Griffin, Shelly) |
|
34 | 34
trial
Witness List
Fri 02/12 11:38 AM
Joint WITNESS LIST by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Griffin, Shelly) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
order
Text-Only Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 02/09 3:35 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER RESCHEDULING TRIAL: Jury Trial re-set for 3/21/2016 08:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. - Entered by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
||
Monday, December 21, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 12/21 3:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/29/2016 08:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 12/21 2:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/21/2015 Disposition: HELD (JJoh) |
||
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Appear*
Wed 12/16 2:29 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 12/21/2015 10:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. Please see image for details. (JJoh) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 12/14 3:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: Settlement Conference held on 12/14/2015. Disposition: NOT SETTLED (LBar) |
||
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Appear*
Fri 11/13 3:13 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 12/14/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub (LBar) |
|
30 | 30
order
Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*
Fri 11/13 2:16 PM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Majzoub : Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion in Limine
Thu 11/12 2:43 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part28 Motion in Limine -. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 11/12 2:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2015 re28 MOTION in Limine filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Court Reporter Jodi Matthews) (JJoh) |
||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Final
Thu 11/12 2:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/10/2015 (Court Reporter Jodi Matthews) (JJoh) |
||
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
motion
In Limine
Fri 10/23 9:53 AM
MOTION in Limine by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Griffin, Shelly) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-K | ||
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Attorney Appearance
Mon 10/19 9:07 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Shelly Lee Griffin appearing on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Griffin, Shelly) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/04 4:45 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Order due 10/26/2015, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson , Jury Trial set for 12/1/2015 08:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 08/04 4:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/4/2015. (JJoh) |
||
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Appear*
Fri 07/24 12:56 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 8/4/2015 03:30 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson (JJoh) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
11
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion & Order
Tue 05/26 2:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
|
notice
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
Tue 05/26 2:34 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 6/9/2015 is Cancelled re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (JJoh) |
||
order
Text-Only Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Tue 05/26 2:57 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Paul J. Komives to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub pursuant to Administrative Order. (SSch) |
||
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Hearing on Motion*
Mon 04/20 11:38 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING on16 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2015 02:30 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson (JJoh) |
|
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
trial
Exhibit
Tue 02/03 10:08 AM
EXHIBIT K re21 Reply to Response to Motion by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Berlin, Cary) |
|
Wednesday, January 07, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 01/07 4:02 PM
REPLY to Response re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit I - K | ||
Tuesday, December 23, 2014 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order
Tue 12/23 3:44 PM
AGREED ORDER Extending Deadline re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company: Reply due by 1/7/2015 - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
|
Wednesday, December 17, 2014 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 12/17 1:12 PM
RESPONSE to16 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Exhibits filed by All Plaintiffs. (Counard, Allen) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff Examination Under Oath | ||
Friday, December 05, 2014 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order
Fri 12/05 3:18 PM
ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to16 MOTION for Summary Judgment :( Response due by 12/17/2014 ) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
|
Friday, November 21, 2014 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 11/21 2:55 PM
ORDER Adjourning Dates Related to Trial. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) |
|
Thursday, November 13, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary) | |
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul H. Johnson, Jr on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Johnson, Paul) | |
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Status Conference held on 11/13/2014. (JJoh) | ||
Thursday, November 06, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 11/13/2014 02:30 PM (NEW TIME) before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate call. (JJoh) | |
Monday, September 22, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 1st Supplemental WITNESS LIST by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Johnson, Joseph) | |
Wednesday, August 27, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 WITNESS LIST by All Plaintiffs (Counard, Allen) | |
Friday, August 22, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 WITNESS LIST by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Johnson, Joseph) | |
Wednesday, June 18, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/13/2014 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 12/1/2014 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson , and Jury Trial set for 2/18/2015 08:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) | |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/18/2014. Disposition: Order issued. (JJoh) | ||
Tuesday, June 10, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/18/2014 01:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson . (JJoh) | |
Wednesday, May 07, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER re7 Notice of Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh) | |
Tuesday, May 06, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of reassignment from District Judge Patrick J. Duggan to District Judge Laurie J. Michelson pursuant to Administrative Order 14-AO-030. (SSch) | |
Tuesday, April 29, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/31/2014 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/15/2014 Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Patrick J. Duggan Jury Trial set for January/February, 2015 before District Judge Patrick J. Duggan Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre) | |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Patrick J. Duggan: Scheduling Conference held on 4/29/2014 (MOre) | ||
Tuesday, April 15, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph C. Johnson appearing on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Johnson, Joseph) | |
Thursday, April 10, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2014 02:45 PM before District Judge Patrick J. Duggan (MOre) | |
Thursday, March 27, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary) | |
2 | 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 14-002870-CK. Receipt No: 0645-4567089 - Fee: $ 400 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Berlin, Cary) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (TMcg) |