AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION et al v. AZAR
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Carl J Nichols |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-03619 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Case in other court: | USCA, 20-05193 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 01, 2020 5:32 AM EDT |
Amicus
ASSOCIATION OF MATURE AMERICAN CITIZENS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
PATIENTRIGHTSADVOCATE.ORG
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
TEXAS PUBLIC POLICY FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEX M. AZAR, II
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
THIRTY-SEVEN STATE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATIONS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, May 13, 2021 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 05/13 5:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the39 Mandate and [39-1] Judgment entered by the Court of Appeals, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 13, 2021. (lccjn3) |
||
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 02/25 3:04 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to37 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,, filed by PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER ; USCA Case Number 20-5193 (Attachment: #1 Judgement)(eg) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 07/02 1:19 PM
USCA Case Number 20-5193 for37 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,, filed by PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER. (zrdj) |
||
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Thu 06/25 11:02 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re37 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw) |
|
Wednesday, June 24, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Wed 06/24 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to36 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,35 Memorandum & Opinion by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-7264920. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 06/23 2:49 PM
ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 23, 2020. (lccjn3) |
|
35 | 35
43
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 06/23 2:44 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 23, 2020. (lccjn3) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Transcript
Fri 05/15 11:02 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING before Judge Carl J. Nichols held on May 7, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-73. Date of Issuance: 5/15/2020. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2020.(Wayne, Bryan) (Main Document 34 replaced on 5/26/2020) (zeg). |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2020 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 05/11 5:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2020 re13 ,19 Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. Motions heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Bryan Wayne) (zcdw) |
||
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/01 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Certified Supplement to the Administrative Record by ALEX M. AZAR, II(Baer, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Supplemented Record, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Revised Index | ||
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 04/22 4:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs'13 Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's19 Motion for Summary Judgment shall be held by videoconference on May 7, 2020, at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 22, 2020. (lccjn3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/23 1:50 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing re13 ,19 set for 5/7/2020 at 2:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC hearing before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcdw) |
||
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/07 5:35 PM
NOTICE by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA re Order,, (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Joint Appendix
Tue 04/07 4:45 PM
JOINT APPENDIX in Support of Parties' Motions and Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA.(Stetson, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Vol. I, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Vol. II, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Vol. III | ||
Monday, April 06, 2020 | ||
order
.Order
Mon 04/06 1:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of In re: Extension of Postponed Court Proceedings in Standing Order 20-9 and Limiting Court Operations in Exigent Circumstances Created by the COVID-19 Pandemic ,[LINK:Extension of Postponed Court Proceedings 20-19] , it is hereby ORDERED that the Hearing scheduled fo r April 22, 2020, is POSTPONED until further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 6, 2020. (lccjn3) |
||
Tuesday, March 24, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Tue 03/24 8:33 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Baer, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Thu 03/05 11:28 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant's29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File His Summary Judgment Reply Brief, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that Defendant shall file his Reply Brief on or before March 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 5, 2020. (lccjn3) |
||
order
.Order
Thu 03/05 11:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs'13 Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's19 Motion for Summary Judgment is set for April 22, 2020, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 19. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 5, 2020. (lccjn3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 03/05 12:55 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Motions Hearing set for 4/22/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (mac) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 03/05 12:58 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Reply Brief due by 3/24/2020. (mac) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/12 9:00 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/24/2020. (zcdw) |
||
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to
Wed 03/04 7:08 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Reply Brief by ALEX M. AZAR, II(Baer, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 03/02 5:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the25 Consent Motion of Thirty-Seven State Hospital Associations for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the Brief is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 2, 2020. (lccjn3) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 03/02 5:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the unopposed26 Motion of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the Brief is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 2, 2020. (lccjn3) |
||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 02/28 9:27 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER. (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
27 | 27
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Fri 02/28 9:26 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER.(Stetson, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 02/28 5:38 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Bucholtz, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 02/28 11:41 AM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by THIRTY-SEVEN STATE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATIONS(Golder, Chad) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Appendix A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Amicus Brief
Thu 02/20 3:13 PM
AMICUS BRIEF by ASSOCIATION OF MATURE AMERICAN CITIZENS, INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, PATIENTRIGHTSADVOCATE.ORG, TEXAS PUBLIC POLICY FOUNDATION. (eg) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 02/14 10:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiffs'22 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File Brief, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs shall file their combined brief in opposition to Defendant's19 Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Plaintiffs'13 Motion for Summary Judgment on or before February 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 14, 2020. (lccjn3) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 02/14 10:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon Review of the23 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendant, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is Granted and the [23-1] Brief is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 14, 2020. (lccjn3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Sun 02/16 4:35 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's response to19 Cross Motion, and reply to13 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/28/2020. (zcdw) |
||
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 02/13 10:54 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by PATIENTRIGHTSADVOCATE.ORG, INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, TEXAS PUBLIC POLICY FOUNDATION, ASSOCIATION OF MATURE AMERICAN CITIZENS(Harris, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Amicus Curiae Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 02/12 4:30 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support ,13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER(Stetson, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/04 10:36 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record by ALEX M. AZAR, II(Baer, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Administrative Record Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Administrative Record Certification | ||
20 | 20
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Tue 02/04 10:32 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Baer, Michael) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 02/04 10:31 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by ALEX M. AZAR, II(Baer, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule
Wed 12/18 4:24 PM
ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 18, 2019. (lccjn3) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 12/18 10:56 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/12/2019 (Druding, Kyle) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Wed 12/18 10:54 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/11/2019. (Druding, Kyle) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Briefing Schedule
Fri 12/13 11:42 PM
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER(Stetson, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/13 6:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Hendry Baer on behalf of All Defendants (Baer, Michael) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 12/09 11:10 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER(Stetson, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of AHA, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of AAMC, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of NACH, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of FAH, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Bothwell, | ||
Att: 7 Declaration of Memorial, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration Providence Holy Cross, | ||
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Fri 12/06 6:41 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/6/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/4/2020. (Druding, Kyle) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Thu 12/05 5:29 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 12/05 5:21 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zrdj) |
||
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/04 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Mitchell Druding on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Druding, Kyle) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/04 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Margaret Cook on behalf of AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER (Cook, Susan) |
|
8 | 8
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 12/04 2:07 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
7 | 7
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 12/04 2:06 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
6 | 6
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 12/04 2:05 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
5 | 5
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 12/04 2:04 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
4 | 4
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 12/04 2:03 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
3 | 3
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 12/04 2:03 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 12/04 2:02 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
1 | 1
31
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/04 1:40 AM
COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6613217) filed by PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM.(Stetson, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |