Mary Bush, et al v. Katherine Platt
Original Case: 2:19-cv-04414
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03745 |
Type | civil / private / usc 2241 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2020 11:13 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE KATHERINE B.L. PLATT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARY BUSH, individuallly and as daughter, next friend and trustee of Genevieve Bush
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
GENEVIEVE BUSH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/26/2020 11:13 AM EST |
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Genevieve Bush and Mary Bush in District Court No. 2-19-cv-04414. (KR) | ||
Att: 1 10 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order 111819 | ||
Att: 3 6 pgs District Court Memorandum 111819 | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs District Court Order 102319 | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 6 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs OSEI ORDER SENT informing Appellant Mary Bush that a party cannot represent another party in this Court. Notice of Appeal must be signed by all Appellants and returned to Clerk's Office. (KR) |