Binakis v. Sakayama et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Louis L Stanton |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-11216 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 (a) False representation of goods sold in interstate commerce |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 03, 2020 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lynne Sakayama
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Sakayama
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TNG Earthling Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paraskevas Binakis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 03/18 4:35 PM
ORDER: It having been reported to the court that this action is settled, it is ORDERED, that this action is dismissed with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within thirty days of the date of this order either party may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the court's calendar. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/18/2020) (mro) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Wed 03/18 12:12 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Justin Mercer, Esq. dated March 18, 2020 re: parties' settlement in principle. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis..(Mercer, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 02/25 4:56 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint .,16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . . Document filed by Lynne Sakayama, Robert Sakayama, TNG Earthling Inc...(Pascale, Brian) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 02/25 4:54 PM
DECLARATION of Brian C. Pascale in Support re:19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint .,16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint .. Document filed by Lynne Sakayama, Robert Sakayama, TNG Earthling Inc...(Pascale, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Tue 02/25 4:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Document filed by Lynne Sakayama, Robert Sakayama, TNG Earthling Inc.. Responses due by 3/18/2020 Return Date set for 4/1/2020 at 05:00 PM..(Pascale, Brian) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
Tue 02/25 4:13 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Brian Curtis Pascale to RE-FILE Document 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. ERROR(S): supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion are both found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi) |
||
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 02/13 5:38 PM
STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS: IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for the undersigned parties, that the due date of Plaintiffs Opposition is extended from February 19, 2020 to March 18, 2020 and Defendants' Reply from February 26 to April 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/13/2020) (rro) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 02/13 4:02 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Justin Mercer, Esq. dated 02/13/2020. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis..(Mercer, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation | ||
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Wed 02/05 12:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Document filed by Lynne Sakayama, Robert Sakayama, TNG Earthling Inc.. Responses due by 2/19/2020 Return Date set for 2/26/2020 at 10:00 AM..(Pascale, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Brian C. Pascale, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/05 12:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Curtis Pascale on behalf of Lynne Sakayama, Robert Sakayama, TNG Earthling Inc...(Pascale, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Tue 01/21 9:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. TNG Earthling Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Mercer, Justin) |
|
13 | 13
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Tue 01/21 9:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lynne Sakayama served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Mercer, Justin) |
|
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Tue 01/21 9:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Robert Sakayama served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Mercer, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/18 2:23 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TNG Earthling Inc.. (jgo) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/18 2:22 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Sakayama. (jgo) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/18 2:22 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lynne Sakayama. (jgo) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 12/17 1:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TNG Earthling Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Lin, David) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 12/17 1:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lynne Sakayama, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Lin, David) |
|
6 | 6
misc
AO 120 Form Patent - Case Opening - Submitted
Tue 12/17 1:45 PM
AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 12/17 1:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Sakayama, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Lin, David) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 12/17 1:42 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Dong Ann Lin to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Each summons request must be filed as a sperate event or one summons request may be used by attaching a rider. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) |
||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 12/16 10:58 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Sakayama, Lynne Sakayama, TNG Earthling Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis.(Lin, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
3 | 3
misc
AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Mon 12/16 10:46 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Lin, David) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 12/09 11:10 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . (pne) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 12/09 11:11 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pne) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 12/09 11:11 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form
Mon 12/09 11:13 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney David Dong Ann Lin to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) |
||
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 12/06 5:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lin, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/06 5:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Lynne Sakayama, Robert Sakayama, TNG Earthling Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18237103)Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis.(Lin, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |