Cunningham v. JP3 Enterprises, LLC, DBA My Vehicle Protection et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Amos L Mazzant, III |
Referred: | Christine A Nowak |
Case #: | 4:19-cv-00902 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Federal Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 03, 2020 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EFS Companies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EGV Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ensurety Ventures, LLC, dba Omega Auto Care
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JP3 Enterprises, LLC, DBA My Vehicle Protection
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John/Jane Does 1-4
|
|
Defendant
Lyndon Southern Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James William Pyant
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Drew Gomberg
|
|
Defendant
Suncoast Merchant Services, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Craig Cunningham
3000 Custer Road Ste 270-206
Plano, TX 75075 |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
70 | 70
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Thu 07/23 10:43 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Craig Cunningham as to63 Order. (rpc, ) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
69 | 69
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Mon 07/20 3:39 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Craig Cunningham as to66 Order. (daj, ) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
68 | 68
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 07/16 11:00 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that, by agreement of Plaintiff and Defendants, all claims against Defendant Defendants JP3 Enterprises, LLC, Ensurety Ventures, LLC d/b/a Omega Auto Care, Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, EGV Companies, Inc., Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc., EFS Companies, LLC, James William Pyant, Drew Gomberg, and Suncoast Merchant Services, LLC in the above-entitled and number action are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that, by agreement of Plaintiff and Defendants, each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this civil action. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/16/2020. (daj, ) |