Payment Alliance International, Inc. v. Merchant Owned Payment Alliance, LLC et al
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Simpson, III |
Case #: | 3:12-cv-00175 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2012 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2012 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 14, 2016 12:42 PM EST |
Defendant
Enablest, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Patrick Graf
|
|
Defendant
Graf International, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Merchant Owned Payment Alliance, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Payment Alliance International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 22, 2012 | ||
12 | 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Patrick Graf [DN 11]. (SJS) | |
Friday, August 10, 2012 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/9/12. Counsel for pltf having file a notice of voluntary dismissal [DN 10], no answer or other responsive pleading have been filed on behalf of the dfts. This case is DISMISSED from the Ct's docket without prejudice and without costs or fees to any party.cc:counsel, Mailed copies to Merchant Owned Payment Alliance, LLC, Enablest, LLC, Patrick Graf (SJS) | |
Wednesday, August 08, 2012 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Payment Alliance International, Inc. (O'Brien, Thomas) | |
Friday, June 08, 2012 | ||
9 | 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Patrick Graf served on 6/2/2012, answer due 6/23/2012. (TLB) | |
Thursday, April 26, 2012 | ||
8 | 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Payment Alliance International, Inc.. Enablest, LLC served on 4/9/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (O'Brien, Thomas) | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Payment Alliance International, Inc.. Graf International, LLC served on 4/9/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (O'Brien, Thomas) | |
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Payment Alliance International, Inc.. Merchant Owned Payment Alliance, LLC served on 4/9/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (O'Brien, Thomas) | |
Wednesday, April 04, 2012 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Filing or Determination re:Patent or Trademark re1 Complaint,, (JSS) | |
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Enablest, LLC, Patrick Graf, Graf International, LLC, Merchant Owned Payment Alliance, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JSS) | |
Att: 1 Summons Issued to Enablest, LLC, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Issued to Graf International, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Patrick Graf | ||
Tuesday, April 03, 2012 | ||
3 | 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Charles R. Simpson III. Magistrate designation: Dave Whalin. (JSS) | |
Monday, April 02, 2012 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Payment Alliance Processing Corporation for Payment Alliance International, Inc.. by Payment Alliance International, Inc.. (JSS) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Enablest, LLC, Patrick Graf, Graf International, LLC, Merchant Owned Payment Alliance, LLC Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 6441399168., filed by Payment Alliance International, Inc.. (JSS) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Payment Alliance Registered Marks, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Cease & Desist Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Certified Mail Unclaimed, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Tendered-Merchant Owned Payment Alliance, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Tendered-Enablest LLC, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Tendered-Graf International LLC, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Tendered-Patrick Graf |