Goulas v. Lagreca Services, Inc. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:12-cv-00898 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2012 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2014 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 14, 2015 4:03 AM CDT |
Counter Defendant
Jennifer N. Goulas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LaGreca Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charles P. LaGreca, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal P. Goulas
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Claimant
LaGreca Drilling, L.L.C.
Terminated: 04/01/2013
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
LaGreca HDD, L.L.C.
Terminated: 04/01/2013
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
LaGreca Transport, L.L.C.
Terminated: 04/01/2013
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Charles P. LaGreca, Jr.
Terminated: 04/01/2013
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
LaGreca, L.L.C.
Terminated: 04/01/2013
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Lagreca Services, Inc.
Terminated: 04/01/2013
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Neal P. Goulas
Terminated: 04/01/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LaGreca, Inc.
Terminated: 04/19/2012
|
Represented By
|