Middleton v. ReconTrust Company, N.A.. et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Lloyd D George |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-00477 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 31, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2014 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 11, 2014 10:22 PM PST |
Defendant
ALG Trustee, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ReconTrust Company, N.A..
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ervin Middleton
2375 E. Tropicana Ave., #358
Las Vegas, NV 89119 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 10, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant ReconTrust Company, N.A... (Shevorski, Steven) | |
Thursday, June 05, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of ALG Trustee, LLC and ReconTrust Company, N.A. and against Ervin Middleton. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 6/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) | |
16 | 16 ORDER Granting5 Motion to Set Aside Default Due to Improper Service of Process. Granting6 Motion to Dismiss to Dismiss Due to Improper Service of Process. This matter is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) | |
Friday, May 23, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than June 4, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) | |
Monday, May 05, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 STATUS REPORT by Defendant ReconTrust Company, N.A... (Shevorski, Steven) | |
Friday, April 18, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 NON-OPPOSITION to6 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Improper Service of Process and for Failure to State a Claim ; filed by Defendant ReconTrust Company, N.A... (Shevorski, Steven) | |
12 | 12 NON-OPPOSITION to5 MOTION to Set Aside Default Due to Improper Service of Process ; filed by Defendant ReconTrust Company, N.A... (Shevorski, Steven) | |
11 | 11 STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant ReconTrust Company, N.A... (Shevorski, Steven) | |
Thursday, April 10, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by ReconTrust Company, N.A.. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of America, N.A., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for ReconTrust Company, N.A.. added. . (Shevorski, Steven) | |
Tuesday, April 01, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:13-cv-01376-JCM-CWH and 2:14-cv-00477-LDG-GWF by Defendant ReconTrust Company, N.A...(Shevorski, Steven) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
8 | 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for7 Klingele Minute Order, by Defendant ReconTrust Company, N.A... (Shevorski, Steven) | |
7 | 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Improper Service of Process and for Failure to State a Claim : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) | |
Monday, March 31, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Improper Service of Process and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant ReconTrust Company, N.A... Responses due by 4/17/2014. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/10/2014. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/15/2014.(Shevorski, Steven) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Set Aside Default Due to Improper Service of Process by Defendant ReconTrust Company, N.A... Responses due by 4/17/2014.(Shevorski, Steven) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for3 Minute Order re Removal, by Defendant ReconTrust Company, N.A... (Shevorski, Steven) | |
3 | 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Lloyd D. George, on 3/31/2014. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/18/2014. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MAJ) | |
1 | 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Case Number 12A003499, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-3185137), filed by ReconTrust Company, N.A... Proof of service due by 2/28/2013. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/10/2014. (Shevorski, Steven) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Case assigned to Judge Lloyd D. George and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MAJ) |