SAFA JEWELERS, INC. v. GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Susan D Wigenton |
Referred: | Edward S Kiel |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-21782 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:15 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 20, 2020 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRICE LE TROADEC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAFA JEWELERS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
order
1 - Terminate Hearings Order
Wed 01/06 2:42 PM
TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference set for March 22, 2021 is canceled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/6/2021. (as, ) |
|
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 01/06 9:52 AM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/6/2021. (sm) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)
Tue 01/05 9:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by SAFA JEWELERS, INC.. (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 12/07 4:59 PM
ORDER that a telephone status conference is scheduled for March 22, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel; Plaintiff is granted leave to file a letter application seeking an Order to file a consolidated motion in this District for enforcement of all third-party subpoenas. Defendants may file an opposition to the letter application within seven days after the filing of the letter application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/7/2020. (sm) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 12/08 3:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/7/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/03 11:15 AM
Reset Deadlines as to33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 1/19/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) |
||
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/03 11:14 AM
ORDER granting plaintiff's request for an adjournment of Defendants' pending motion for judgment on pleadings33 from 12/21/2020 to 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/2/2020. (sm) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Wed 12/02 12:38 PM
Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Letter
Tue 12/01 11:23 AM
Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/18 9:14 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cds) |
||
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Letter Rule 7.1
Tue 11/17 9:09 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by SAFA JEWELERS, INC. re33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/16 8:57 AM
Set Deadlines as to33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) |
||
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Fri 11/13 3:51 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by All Defendants.(GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Ronald Giller, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Certification Certification of Service | ||
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/19 3:25 PM
ORDER that the application (ECF No. 31) is DENIED without prejudice to defendants right to seek to quash any of the subpoenas after they are issued. Defendants are granted leave to file motions seeking to quash the subpoenas in a manner that is in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(b), 26(c), 45(d)(2)(B), and 45(d)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/19/2020. (sm) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Letter
Fri 10/16 12:27 PM
Letter from Ronald A. Giller, Esq..(GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, September 17, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/17 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE MARIE IMBORNONE on behalf of GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC., BRICE LE TROADEC (IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 09/16 4:23 PM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is set for December 7, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in instructions. Please mark your calendars accordingly. The parties shall file a joint letter, at least three days before the conference, advising of the status of discovery and any other issues to be addressed. The Court's Case Management Order can be found at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/CaseManagementOrder.pdf. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/16/2020. (as, ) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 09/16 4:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/16/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Fri 09/11 10:24 AM
Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 08/31 3:28 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 08/18 9:10 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC., BRICE LE TROADEC, filed by SAFA JEWELERS, INC..(SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 07/23 5:43 PM
ORDER that a telephone status conference is scheduled for September 16, 2020 at11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel; the period for fact discovery is extended through January 18, 2021; motions to add new parties, whether by amended or third-party complaint, and motions to amend pleadings must be filed no later than October 18, 2020; all affirmative expert reports shall be served by March 15, 2021; responsive expert reports by May 14, 2021; depositions of all experts by 7/1/2021; Plaintiffs Cross-Motion15 is granted; Plaintiff granted leave to file an amended complaint by 7/31/2020; Defendants' motion13 is administratively terminated; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/22/2020. (sm) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 07/22 1:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/22/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Friday, July 17, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Fri 07/17 1:50 PM
Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Tue 07/07 2:37 PM
TEXT ORDER: The extension requests set forth in the joint letter of the parties under ECF No.22 will be addressed at the upcoming telephone status conference, which is currently scheduled for July 22, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/7/2020. (as, ) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Fri 06/26 12:17 PM
Letter.(MUSHNICK, JASON) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for new deadlines | ||
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Discovery Confidentiality Order
Fri 06/19 9:36 AM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 6/18/2020. (sm) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Thu 06/18 10:03 AM
Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov.(SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Confidentiality Order on Consent | ||
Saturday, May 30, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Sat 05/30 9:23 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SAFA JEWELERS, INC. re13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/29 1:27 PM
ORDER granting Safa Jewelers permission to file a brief, two page sur-reply in connection with Defendants' pending motion for judgment on the pleadings returnable 6/1/2020. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/28/2020. (sm) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Wed 05/27 4:05 PM
Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Tue 05/26 4:28 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of R.Giller, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, May 19, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/19 9:32 AM
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Leave to File. Motion set for 6/15/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) |
||
Monday, May 18, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 05/18 3:35 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by SAFA JEWELERS, INC. re13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Marisa R Sverdlov, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/30 3:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 6/1/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cds) |
||
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Letter Rule 7.1
Wed 04/29 10:01 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/27 12:53 PM
Set Deadlines as to13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 5/18/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) |
||
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Fri 04/24 4:11 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by All Defendants. Responses due by 5/18/2020(GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Ronald Giller, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support, | ||
Att: 7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/09 9:03 AM
AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 4/7/2020. (sm) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Fri 04/03 6:09 PM
Letter.(MUSHNICK, JASON) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/03 2:23 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/3/2020. (sm) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 03/03 11:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Scheduling Conference held on 3/3/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, ) |
||
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 02/03 12:05 PM
LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference shall be held on 3/3/2020 at 10:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/3/2020. (as, ) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
Fri 01/31 2:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC., BRICE LE TROADEC identifying Seiko Watch Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (GILLER, RONALD) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/31 2:56 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC., BRICE LE TROADEC.(GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 01/29 12:39 PM
Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre no longer assigned to case. (ps, ) |
||
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/17 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JASON TODD MUSHNICK on behalf of GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC., BRICE LE TROADEC (MUSHNICK, JASON) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Fri 01/17 3:30 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 submitted by BRICE LE TROADEC, GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/31/2020. (sm) |
||
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Thu 01/16 4:13 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Grand Seiko Corporation of America, Inc., and Brice Le Troadec. Attorney RONALD A. GILLER for GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC.,RONALD A. GILLER for BRICE LE TROADEC added. (GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Fri 12/27 3:45 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by SAFA JEWELERS, INC.. GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC. served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020; BRICE LE TROADEC served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 12/23 1:08 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC., BRICE LE TROADEC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
Mon 12/23 11:15 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAFA JEWELERS, INC.. (SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/23 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against GRAND SEIKO CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC., BRICE LE TROADEC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10200277) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SAFA JEWELERS, INC..(SVERDLOV, MARISA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 12/23 11:43 AM
Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps, ) |