Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Michael J Juneau
Referred: Patrick J Hanna
Case #: 6:19-cv-01670
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2019
Terminated:Apr 15, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Jun 20, 2020 4:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Todd D'Albor
Represented By
Jason Thomas Reed
Neuner Pate
contact info
Bradley Lance Person
Neuner Pate
contact info
Defendant
Eduardo Mendoza
Represented By
Jason Thomas Reed
Neuner Pate
contact info
Bradley Lance Person
Neuner Pate
contact info
Defendant
Police Dept New Iberia
Represented By
Jason Thomas Reed
Neuner Pate
contact info
Bradley Lance Person
Neuner Pate
contact info
Plaintiff
Corey Mata
Represented By
Timothy Claude Ellender, Jr
Law Office Of Timothy C Ellender Jr
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, January 03, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 01/03 1:10 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bradley Lance Person terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/3/2022. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
12 12 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 12/29 2:39 PM
MOTION to Withdraw B. Lance Person as Attorney by Todd D'Albor, Eduardo Mendoza. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/29/2021.(aty,Person, Bradley) Modified filer on 12/29/2021 (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Consent
Monday, January 04, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 01/04 10:59 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Timothy Claude Ellender, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/4/2021. (crt,Alexander, E)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
10 10 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 12/23 2:08 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Timothy Claude Ellender, Jr. as Attorney by Corey Mata. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/23/2020.(aty,Ellender, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 04/15 12:06 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT all proceedings and deadlines in this matter be stayed pending the resolution of the plaintiffs, Corey Matas, state court criminal proceedings. The clerk's office is directed to administratively close this case until the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 4/15/2020. (crt,Guidry, C)
Related: [-]
order Order for Administrative Closure Wed 04/15 12:10 PM
Administrative Closure. See Rec. Doc.9 (crt,Guidry, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/13 4:25 PM
MOTION Stay of proceedings by Todd D'Albor. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/13/2020.(aty,Reed, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order
utility Motions Transferred Tue 04/14 8:56 AM
Motions Transferred regarding8 MOTION to Stay. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
7 7 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Tue 03/24 2:44 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/24/2020. (crt,Nations, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
6 6 order Scheduling Order - Hanna/Juneau/Summerhays/Whitehurst Thu 03/19 9:41 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 3/22/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2021 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 4/9/2020. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 4/13/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 5/7/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/27/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 7/28/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 8/27/2020. Discovery deadline 9/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2020. Daubert Motions due by 10/26/2020. Motions in Limine due by 1/25/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/25/2021. Pretrial Order due by 2/9/2021. Bench Books due by 2/9/2021. Trial Depositions due by 2/9/2021. Real Time glossary due by 2/16/2021. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 2/16/2021. Signed by direction of the Court s/Christine Guidry on 3/19/2020. (crt,Guidry, C)
Related: [-]
5 5 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 03/19 9:40 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held with Courtroom Deputy: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/19/2020. Following discussion, a trial date of March 22, 2021 and a pretrial date of February 23, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. were selected.A scheduling order will be issued. (crt,Guidry, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
4 4 order Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 03/10 4:08 PM
MINUTE ENTRY: At the direction of the Court, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on March 19, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2020 09:30 AM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy). (crt,Guidry, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 4:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Corey Mata by Eduardo Mendoza and by Todd D'Albor.(Attorney Jason Thomas Reed added to party Todd D'Albor(pty:dft))(aty,Reed, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Thu 12/26 9:17 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Todd D'Albor, Eduardo Mendoza and Police Dept New Iberia. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 6:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4140778) filed by Corey Mata.(Attorney Timothy Claude Ellender, Jr added to party Corey Mata(pty:pla))(aty,Ellender, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/26 9:15 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Related: [-]