Axon Enterprise Incorporated v. Federal Trade Commission et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Dominic W Lanza |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00014 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 03, 2020 |
Re-opened: | May 22, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Ninth Circuit, 20-15662 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 01, 2020 2:05 AM MST |
Amicus
New Civil Liberties Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rohit Chopra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federal Trade Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noah Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Simons
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rebecca Slaughter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christine Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Axon Enterprise Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
63 | 63
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Wed 10/11 8:30 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the stipulation of dismissal (Doc.62 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims in the above-captioned case are dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all hearings and deadlines are vacated, and all pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/10/2023. (SLQ) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
62 | 62
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 10/10 2:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Axon Enterprise Incorporated.(Petersen, Pamela) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Order Returning Matter to Adjudication & Dismissing Complaint |