Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-10010

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-bk-10020
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2020
Terminated:Dec 28, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Borden Dairy Company of Ohio, LLC
8750 N Central Expy Ste 400
Dallas, TX 75231-6417
Represented By
M. Blake Cleary
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
5 5 order Final Decree Tue 12/28 2:18 PM
Final Decree and Order Closing The Post-effective Date Debtors Chapter 11 Cases and Terminating All Claims And Noticing Services. Signed on 12/28/2021 (DMC)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 12/28 2:31 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
4 4 misc Exhibit Wed 08/05 2:00 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed, in accordance with the corporate name change of Borden Dairy Company of Ohio, LLC to BDC of Ohio, LLC. (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 01/08 1:33 PM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Borden Dairy Company, Case No. 20-10010 (CSS); Borden Dairy Holdings, LLC, Case No. 20-10011 (CSS); National Dairy, LLC, Case No. 20-10012 (CSS); Borden Dairy Company of Alabama, LLC, Case No. 20-10013 (CSS); Borden Dairy Company of Cincinnati, LLC, Case No. 20-10014 (CSS); Borden Transport Company of Cincinnati, LLC, Case No. 20-10015 (CSS); Borden Dairy Company of Florida, LLC, Case No. 20-10016 (CSS); Borden Dairy Company of Kentucky, LLC, Case No. 20-10017 (CSS); Borden Dairy Company of Louisiana, LLC, Case No. 20-10018 (CSS); Borden Dairy Company of Madisonville, LLC, Case No. 20-10019 (CSS); Borden Dairy Company of Ohio, LLC, Case No. 20-10020 (CSS); Borden Transport Company of Ohio, LLC, Case No. 20-10021 (CSS); Borden Dairy Company of South Carolina, LLC, Case No. 20-10022 (CSS); Borden Dairy Company of Texas, LLC, Case No. 20-10023 (CSS); Claims Adjusting Services, LLC, Case No. 20-10024 (CSS); Georgia Soft Serve Delights, LLC, Case No. 20-10025 (CSS); NDH Transport, LLC, Case No. 20-10026 (CSS); and RGC, LLC, Case No. 20-10027 (CSS). All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed, and all further docket entries shall be made, in Case No. 20-10010 (CSS). Signed on 1/8/2020 (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 01/06 9:15 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-10020 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9587435, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 05, 2020
1 1 25 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 01/05 9:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Borden Dairy Company of Ohio, LLC. (Cleary, M.)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Sun 01/05 10:07 PM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (BA)
Related: [-]