Hendershott v. Ostuw
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-80006 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Oct 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 28, 2021 |
Case in other court: | 20-13991-CC USCA, 21-10358-C 21-12343-C USCA, 21-13021-G |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 02, 2020 6:16 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Joel Ostuw
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Gary Hendershott
2015 North Federal Avenue Apt 202
Delray Beach, FL 33483 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joel Ostuw
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Mark E. Stein
Mark Stein Law 2999 N.E. 191st Street Suite 330 Aventura
Aventura, FL 33160 |
|
Plaintiff
Gary Hendershott
2015 North Federal Avenue Apt 202
Delray Beach, FL 33483 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Echota Fabrics, Inc.
Terminated: 06/16/2020
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
order
Order Referring Motion
Wed 10/05 4:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING for appropriate disposition 262 MOTION for Attorney Fees to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (ccr) |