Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas M Durkin
Case #: 1:20-cv-00110
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2020
Terminated:Feb 10, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jul 05, 2020 5:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Timothy Adkins
Defendant
Command Mechanical Group, LLC
Plaintiff
Chicago Area Mechanical Contracting Industry Improvement Trust
Represented By
Joseph Edward Mallon
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Krol
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipe Fitters' Association, Local Union 597, U.A.
Represented By
Joseph Edward Mallon
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Krol
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipe Fitters' Individual Account & 401(k) Plan, Local 597
Represented By
Joseph Edward Mallon
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Krol
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipe Fitters' Retirement Fund, Local 597
Represented By
Joseph Edward Mallon
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Krol
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipe Fitters' Training Fund, Local 597
Represented By
Joseph Edward Mallon
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Krol
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipe Fitters' Welfare Fund, Local 597
Represented By
Joseph Edward Mallon
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Krol
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipe Fitting Council of Greater Chicago
Represented By
Joseph Edward Mallon
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Allen Krol
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info
William M. Blumthal, Jr.
Johnson & Krol, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/26/2023 1:42 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )
Related: [-]
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Timothy Adkins, Command Mechanical Group, LLC (jg, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chicago Area Mechanical Contracting Industry Improvement Trust, Pipe Fitters' Training Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Individual Account & 401(k) Plan, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Welfare Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Retirement Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitting Council of Greater Chicago, Pipe Fitters' Association, Local Union 597, U.A. ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16588399.(Krol, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Subscription Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Area Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Installment Payment Agreement
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Krol, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago Area Mechanical Contracting Industry Improvement Trust, Pipe Fitters' Association, Local Union 597, U.A., Pipe Fitters' Individual Account & 401(k) Plan, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Retirement Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Training Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Welfare Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitting Council of Greater Chicago by Jeffrey Allen Krol (Krol, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago Area Mechanical Contracting Industry Improvement Trust, Pipe Fitters' Association, Local Union 597, U.A., Pipe Fitters' Individual Account & 401(k) Plan, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Retirement Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Training Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Welfare Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitting Council of Greater Chicago by Joseph Edward Mallon (Mallon, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chicago Area Mechanical Contracting Industry Improvement Trust, Pipe Fitters' Association, Local Union 597, U.A., Pipe Fitters' Individual Account & 401(k) Plan, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Retirement Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Training Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitters' Welfare Fund, Local 597, Pipe Fitting Council of Greater Chicago by William M. Blumthal, Jr (Blumthal, William)
Related: [-]