Simon v. GTR Source, LLC
Original Case: 1:19-cv-01471
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-00118 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 28, 2022 5:13 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
GTR Source, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Stephen W. Biegel, in his capacity as New York City Marshal, Badge No. 27
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Basil Simon, in his capacity as receiver for FutureNet Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 27 2022
OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court, by JMW, RDS, RJS, FILED.[3408681] [20-118] |
Docket last updated: 10/28/2022 5:08 AM EDT |