Minnesota District Court
Judge:Patrick J Schiltz
Referred: Hildy Bowbeer
Case #: 0:20-cv-00252
Nature of Suit891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts
Cause07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Mar 01, 2020 3:09 AM CST
Defendant
C.H. Robinson Company
Represented By
Mark William Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Peter J. Wozniak
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Adina R Florea
Fafinski Mark & Johnson
contact info
Bradley Richard Hutter
Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A.
contact info
Patrick J Rooney
Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By
Mark William Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Peter J. Wozniak
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Adina R Florea
Fafinski Mark & Johnson
contact info
Bradley Richard Hutter
Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A.
contact info
Patrick J Rooney
Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Robinson Fresh
Represented By
Mark William Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Peter J. Wozniak
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Adina R Florea
Fafinski Mark & Johnson
contact info
Bradley Richard Hutter
Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A.
contact info
Patrick J Rooney
Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Agropecuaria Los Americanos S.C. de R.L. de C.V.
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bowles Farming Company, Inc.
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CA Comerical, S.A.C.
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Coggins
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Global Fresh, S.A.C.
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JMB Farm LLC
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Lusk
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Lusk
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry Lusk
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Moore
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pepas Tropicales del Peru, S.A.C.
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Phil Sandifer & Sons Farms LLC
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Powe Farms Management LLC
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Calhoun Rentz
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Bruce Rentz
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Karla Jo Rentz
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Rentz
Represented By
Francis Greene
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Craig A Stokes
Stokes Law Office LLP
contact info
Andrew T Thomasson
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info
Robert Andrew Pollom
Ketterman Rowland & Westlund
contact info
Philip D Stern
Stern Thomasson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/10/2020 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, July 09, 2020
118 118 order Order/Notice to Attorney Thu 07/09 2:31 PM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Richard Solem, Special Master, on 7/9/2020. Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-00252-PJS-HB, 0:20-cv-00879-PJS-HB (JMK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
117 117 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 07/08 2:59 PM
ORDER FOR RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION. Signed by Richard Solum, Special Master, on 7/7/2020. Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-00252-PJS-HB, 0:20-cv-00879-PJS-HB(JMK)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
116 116 2 pgs order Order to Clarify/Authorize Mon 07/06 11:50 AM
ORDER RE115 Sealed Invoice. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/6/2020.(CLG)
Related: [-]
115 115 misc Sealed Document Mon 07/06 11:41 AM
SEALED INVOICE. (CLG)
Related: [-]