Ward v. Portage County Board of Commissioners et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Lioi |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-00750 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2014 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 12, 2014 8:08 AM EST |
Defendant
Gary Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Portage County Board of Commissioners
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Village of Brady Lake
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marlon Webster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Ward
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 23, 2014 | ||
28 | 28 Dismissal Entry: This cause having come before the Court, and the parties herein, through counsel, having shown that they have resolved and settled their differences and disputes, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants be, and are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own costs. . Judge Sara Lioi on 9/23/2014. (P,J) | |
Monday, September 22, 2014 | ||
27 | 27 Proposed Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Village of Brady Lake, Marlon Webster. (Calderone, Kenneth) Modified text on 9/22/2014 (H,KR). | |
Wednesday, August 27, 2014 | ||
26 | 26 Order: This case having been settled by agreement of the parties, this case hereby is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. Any and all releases, agreements or judgment entries necessary to comply with this settlement shall be executed by the interested parties. A final Agreed Entry, approved by counsel for all parties, shall be filed with the Court on or before September 26, 2014. The Court retains jurisdiction to resolve disputes concerning the memorialization of the settlement agreement in this matter. This case hereby is closed. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/27/2014. (P,J) | |
25 | 25 Motion by Samuel S. Riotte to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff, Instanter filed by Plaintiff Ryan Ward. (Riotte, Samuel) | |
Order [non-document] granting motion by attorney Samuel S. Riotte to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff. . Judge Sara Lioi on 8/27/2014.(P,J) | ||
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On August 27, 2014, the Court conducted a Case Management Conference. Attorneys David Malik and Sara Gedeon participated on behalf of plaintiff, and plaintiff Ryan Ward was present. Attorney Todd Raskin participated on behalf of defendants Portage County Commissioners and Gary Hoffman. Defendant Gary Hoffman was present, and Sheriff Doak, Denise Smith and Maureen Frederick were present as representatives of defendant Portage County. Attorney Kenneth Calderone was present on behalf of defendants Village of Brady Lake and Marlon Webster, and Tom Miller and John Marra were present as representatives of defendants Village of Brady Lake and Marlon Webster. At the outset of the Case Management Conference, all counsel and parties represented to the Court that they wished to pursue settlement discussions. Settlement discussion were undertaken with the Court's assistance and the parties reached a settlement, the terms of which were read into the record with all counsel, parties, and party representatives in attendance and in agreement, and placed under seal. (Court reporter: Caroline Mahnke.) (Time: 1 hour.) (P,J) | ||
Wednesday, August 20, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Ryan Ward. (Gedeon, Sara) | |
Tuesday, July 29, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 Notice of Service of Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Village of Brady Lake. (Calderone, Kenneth) | |
22 | 22 Notice of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosures filed by Gary Hoffman, Portage County Board of Commissioners. (Wright, Cara) | |
Order [non-document] granting the motion to excuse insurance adjuster Katie Lininger from attending the Case Management Conference. (Doc. No.21 .) Ms. Lininger must be available by telephone during the CMC. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/29/2014.(P,J) | ||
Monday, July 28, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 Motion to excuse appearance of Adjuster Katie Lininger from Case Management Conference filed by Gary Hoffman, Portage County Board of Commissioners.(Wright, Cara) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Court Docket | ||
Friday, July 25, 2014 | ||
Order [non-document] granting the motion to excuse insurance adjuster Amy Finnegan from attending the Case Management Conference. (Doc. No.19 .) Ms. Finnegan must be available by telephone during the CMC. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/25/2014.(P,J) | ||
Thursday, July 24, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 Notice of Additional Counsel filed by Village of Brady Lake, Marlon Webster. (Calderone, Kenneth) | |
19 | 19 Motion to excuse appearance of Insurance Adjuster at Case Management Conference filed by Village of Brady Lake, Marlon Webster. (Calderone, Kenneth) | |
Tuesday, July 22, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Ryan Ward. (Gedeon, Sara) | |
17 | 17 Attorney Appearance by Sara M. Gedeon filed by on behalf of Ryan Ward. (Gedeon, Sara) | |
Wednesday, July 09, 2014 | ||
Order [non-document] granting defendants' motion to continue the Case Management Conference. (Doc. No.16 .) The CMC scheduled for 8/28/2014 at 2:00 PM is rescheduled for 8/27/2014 at 10:30 AM. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/9/2014.(P,J) | ||
Tuesday, July 08, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 Motion to continue Case Management Conference or in the Alternative, to allow Cara Wright, Esq. to Attend in Lieu of Lead Counsel filed by Gary Hoffman, Portage County Board of Commissioners.(Raskin, Todd) Modified text on 7/10/2014 (H,KR). | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Raskin's Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - USDC Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Lake County Order | ||
Monday, July 07, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Gary Hoffman, Portage County Board of Commissioners.(Wright, Cara) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Todd M. Raskin | ||
Order [non-document] granting defendants' motion to continue the Case Management Conference. (Doc. No.15 .) The CMC scheduled for 8/12/2014 at 2:00 PM is rescheduled for 8/28/2014 at 2:00 PM. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/7/2014.(P,J) | ||
Thursday, July 03, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Gary Hoffman, no date of service indicated on green card, filed on behalf of Ryan Ward. Related document(s)8 . (K,K) | |
13 | 13 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Portage County Board of Commissioners on 7/1/2014, filed on behalf of Ryan Ward. Related document(s)8 . (K,K) | |
12 | 12 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (P,J) | |
11 | 11 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Case management conference to be held on 8/12/2014 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 526, U.S. District Court, Akron, before Judge Sara Lioi. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 7/22/2014. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 7/29/2014. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/3/2014. (P,J) | |
Tuesday, July 01, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 Notice of Appearance by Cara M. Wright filed on behalf of Gary Hoffman, Portage County Board of Commissioners. (Wright, Cara) Modified text on 7/1/2014 (H,KR). | |
Monday, June 30, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Gary Hoffman, Portage County Board of Commissioners. (Raskin, Todd) | |
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Gary Hoffman(6537) & Portage County Board of Commissioners(6520) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70080150000183466520/6537. (C,BA) | ||
Thursday, June 26, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 Original Summons issued for service upon Gary Hoffman, Portage County Board of Commissioners. (H,KR) | |
Tuesday, June 24, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons for Defendants Gary Hoffman and Portage County Bd. of Commissioners . filed by Ryan Ward.(Riotte, Samuel) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Monday, June 23, 2014 | ||
Order [non-document]: It appearing that Attorney Bradley Levine has complied with Local Rule 83.9, the Court grants his motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff. (Doc. No.6 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 6/23/2014.(P,J) | ||
Thursday, June 19, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Motion for leave by Bradley Levine to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff, instanter filed by Plaintiff Ryan Ward. (Levine, Bradley) Modified text on 6/20/2014 (H,KR). | |
Friday, June 13, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ryan Ward. Village of Brady Lake waiver sent on 6/4/2014, answer due 8/4/2014; Marlon Webster waiver sent on 6/4/2014, answer due 8/4/2014. filed on behalf of Ryan Ward(Riotte, Samuel) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Executed Waiver of Service - M. Webster | ||
Monday, April 28, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Village of Brady Lake, Marlon Webster. (Calderone, Kenneth) | |
Monday, April 07, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/7/2014. (P,J) | |
2 | 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL) Modified text and regenerated NEF on 4/7/2014 (M,TL). | |
Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL) | ||
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL) | ||
Saturday, April 05, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 Complaint with jury demand against Gary Hoffman, Portage County Board of Commissioners, Village of Brady Lake, Marlon Webster. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-6483987. Filed by Ryan Ward. (Riotte, Samuel) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |