Joint Admin
|
5:20-bk-50211 - OGG, Inc.
|
02/05/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
5:20-bk-50212 - Hemp Kentucky LLC
|
02/05/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05006 - Specialty Oils Extraction Manufacturer, LLC v. GenCanna Global USA,Inc.
|
02/24/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05007 - Arrow Farms, LLC v. GenCanna Global USA, Inc.
|
03/10/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05013 - GenCanna Global USA, Inc. v. Furnwood Farm LLC et al
|
03/26/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05020 - Bragg Farms & Co. v. GenCanna Global USA, Inc. et al
|
05/06/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05025 - Electronic Restoration Services, Inc. v. GenCanna Global, Inc.
|
07/01/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05029 - OGGUSA, Inc. v. Jenco Industrial Sales & Services, LLC et al
|
08/26/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05031 - OGGUSA, Inc. v. W.I.S.E. Underwriting Agency Limited et al
|
08/28/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05032 - OGGUSA, Inc. v. Louisville Dryer Company
|
09/17/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05033 - OGGUSA, Inc. et al v. Laidig Systems, Inc.
|
10/09/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05034 - OGGUSA, Inc. et al v. Southern Tier Hemp LLC
|
10/14/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05038 - OGGUSA, Inc. f/k/a GenCanna Global USA, Inc. v. Green Roads of Florida LLC et al
|
11/13/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:20-ap-05039 - OGGUSA, Inc. f/k/a GenCanna Global USA, Inc. v. MedTerra CBD, LLC
|
12/08/2020
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05005 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP et al
|
01/25/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05014 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. CAD Media LLC
|
03/09/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05015 - GenCanna Acquisition Corp. v. Arrow Farms LLC
|
03/26/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05016 - OGGUSA, Inc. f/k/a GenCanna Global USA, Inc. v. Theorem 12, LLC
|
04/01/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05017 - OGGUSA, Inc. f/k/a GenCanna Global USA, Inc. v. Real Remedy, LLC
|
04/01/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05018 - OGGUSA, Inc. f/k/a GenCanna Global USA, Inc. v. Full Impact, LLC
|
04/01/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05019 - OGGUSA, Inc. f/k/a GenCanna Global USA, Inc. v. CBD Unlimited, LLC
|
04/01/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05020 - OGGUSA, Inc. f/k/a GenCanna Global USA, Inc. v. BMH Ventures, Inc. f/k/a Blue Moon Hemp, Inc.
|
04/01/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05170 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, as Trustee for v. 828 Logistics, LLC
|
12/30/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05171 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, as Trustee for v. Alpha Mechanical Service, Inc.
|
12/30/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05172 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, as Trustee for v. Robinson
|
12/30/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05173 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, as Trustee for v. Amin Talati Upadhye, LLP n/k/a Amin Talati Wasserm
|
12/30/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:21-ap-05174 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, as Trustee for v. Bypass Rental Centers of Winchester, Inc.
|
12/30/2021
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05001 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Bypass Rental Centers of Georgetown, Inc.
|
01/01/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05002 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. American Scale Corp.
|
01/04/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05003 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Cantrell Supply, Inc.
|
01/04/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05004 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Pugh Lubricants, LLC
|
01/07/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05005 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Harper
|
01/10/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05006 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Dealigence Inc.
|
01/10/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05007 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Hico Farms Inc.
|
01/11/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05008 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Webb
|
01/11/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05009 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Tudor
|
01/11/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05010 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Pharos Advisors Inc.
|
01/12/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05012 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Holcomb
|
01/12/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05013 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Wells
|
01/14/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05014 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Wiseman
|
01/17/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05015 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Lake Breeze Farms LLC
|
01/17/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05016 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Anderson
|
01/17/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05017 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Lane's Mobile John Inc.
|
01/17/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05018 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Eppic Films Inc
|
01/17/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05019 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Cayce Mill Supply Company
|
01/17/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05020 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Curtis
|
01/17/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05021 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Hemp Kentucky, LLC
|
01/17/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05022 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
|
01/17/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05023 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. ECS Brands Ltd.
|
01/17/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05024 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Farmaceutical Partners LLC
|
01/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05025 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. McMillan LLP
|
01/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05026 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Polymer Packaging, Inc.
|
01/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05027 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Qosina Corporation
|
01/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05028 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Matco Distributors, Inc.
|
01/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05029 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Robert Half International Inc.
|
01/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05030 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Middaugh
|
01/20/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05031 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Landstar System, Inc.
|
01/20/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05032 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Face & Body LLC
|
01/20/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05033 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. S. R. Holding Co., Inc
|
01/20/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05034 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. USA Lab, Inc.
|
01/20/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05035 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Zoe Therapeutics LLC
|
01/20/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05036 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Molecular Health Technologies Florida LLC
|
01/20/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05037 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Edwards et al
|
01/21/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05038 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Donnelley Financial, LLC
|
01/21/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05039 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. BAM Capital LLC
|
01/21/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05041 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Clark
|
01/21/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05042 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. BETTER NUTRITIONALS LLC
|
01/21/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05043 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. The Hemp Industries Association
|
01/25/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05044 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. ARBORETUM COMMERCIAL FINANCE, LLC
|
01/25/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05045 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Hensley
|
01/25/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05046 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. GREAT PLAINS ANALYTICAL LABORATORY, INC.
|
01/25/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05047 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Fleetcor Technologies Operating Company, LLC
|
01/26/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05048 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Morguson
|
01/26/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05049 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Shell
|
01/26/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05050 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. ETC DEVELOPMENT, LLC
|
01/26/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05052 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. ZJ Events LLC
|
03/31/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05053 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Cosmetic Solutions LLC
|
03/31/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05054 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Matt Dearinger Plumbing, LLC
|
03/31/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05055 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. The Garrard County Water Association, Inc.
|
03/31/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05056 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Norflex, Inc.
|
03/31/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05057 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Arbuckle Shackelford
|
03/31/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05058 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. MariMed Hemp Inc.
|
04/20/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05066 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Ohio Transmission LLC
|
10/20/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05067 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. League
|
10/20/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05068 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. GROHAPPY INC.
|
11/01/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05069 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Wiggins
|
11/04/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05072 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Shultz et al
|
12/14/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05073 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Cherry
|
12/14/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05074 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Riley
|
12/14/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05075 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Gough
|
12/14/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05076 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Mathis
|
12/14/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05077 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Rapid Packaging, Inc.
|
12/15/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05078 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Inter County Energy Cooperative Corporation
|
12/15/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05079 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Fast Slow Motion, LLC
|
12/15/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05080 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Fresh Cut Lawn Services of Winchester, Inc.
|
12/15/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05081 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Larry Clark & Son, LLC
|
12/16/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05083 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. WSF Transport, LLC
|
12/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05084 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Winchester Warehouse Company LLC
|
12/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05085 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Terminix Global Holdings, Inc.
|
12/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05086 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
|
12/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05087 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. ProVerde Laboratories, Inc.
|
12/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05088 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Pharmco Laboratories Incorporated
|
12/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:22-ap-05089 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. High Fusion, Inc.
|
12/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05001 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Adobe Inc.
|
01/17/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05002 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Greenfield Global USA, Inc.
|
01/17/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05003 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Historic Taylor Manor, LLC
|
01/17/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05004 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Gallagher
|
01/17/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05005 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Les' Electrical Service LLC
|
01/17/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05006 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Monty's Plant Food Co., Inc.
|
01/17/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05007 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC and Oregon Processing Solutions, LLC
|
01/17/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05008 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. United Rentals
|
01/18/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05009 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Call Center Systems LLC
|
01/18/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05010 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Easley and Faust Properties, LLC
|
01/18/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05011 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Scott Interests L.P.
|
01/18/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05012 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC and PAYCOR, INC.
|
01/18/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05013 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Shannon Stone LLC
|
01/27/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05014 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. David Hocker & Associates, Inc.
|
01/27/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05015 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Day
|
01/27/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05016 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. KPS Sales, LLC
|
01/27/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05017 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Root Sciences LLC
|
01/27/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05018 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Royal Labs Natural Cosmetics Inc.
|
01/27/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05019 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Indiana Fluid Systems Solutions LLC
|
01/27/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05020 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Tierney Storage, LLC
|
01/27/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05021 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
|
01/27/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05022 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. C&C Industrial, LLC
|
02/03/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05023 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Google LLC
|
02/03/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05024 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Tudor
|
02/03/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05025 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Nanticoke Gardens
|
02/03/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05026 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. National Fire Adjustment Co., Inc.
|
02/03/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05027 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. West Kentucky Rural Electric Cooperative Corporati
|
02/03/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05028 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC and Thompson
|
02/06/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05029 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. RNA Corporation
|
02/06/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05030 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Kentucky Department of Agriculture
|
02/06/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05031 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. West Kentucky Rural Telephone Cooperative Corporat
|
02/06/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05032 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. Colder Allied Consulting LLC
|
02/06/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05033 - Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC v. City Line Real Estate Partners LLC
|
02/07/2023
|
Adversary
|
5:23-ap-05036 - GenCanna Acquisition Corp. v. 101 Enterprises, LLC et al
|
03/29/2023
|