Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Chad F Kenney
Case #: 2:20-cv-00456
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 21, 2020 5:37 AM EDT
Defendant
JANE DOE 1
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1
Plaintiff
DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC
Represented By
LANCE ROGERS
Rogers Castor
contact info
BRIAN T. NEWMAN
Rubin Glickman Steinberg & Gifford PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS
Represented By
LANCE ROGERS
Rogers Castor
contact info
BRIAN T. NEWMAN
Rubin Glickman Steinberg & Gifford PC
contact info

GPO Jun 30 2021
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/30/21. 6/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
GPO Jun 30 2021
ORDER THAT THE UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STRIKE AND ALLOW DEFENDANT TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/30/21. 6/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )

Docket last updated: 07/25/2021 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 22, 2021
31 31 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 07/22 2:04 PM
ORDER THAT AN ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED FOR 9/16/2021 AT 8:30 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 6A, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILA., PA 19106, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/22/21. 7/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Certify Tue 07/20 1:58 PM
ORDER THAT MOTION TO CERTIFY (ECF NO. 26) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/20/21.7/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Tue 07/20 1:44 PM
ORDER THAT JANE DOE'S MOTION FOR THE COURT TO APPOINT COUNSEL (ECF NO. 28) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/20/21.7/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
28 28 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 07/16 1:00 PM
MOTION FOR THE COURT TO APPOINT COUNSEL, FILED BY DEFT JANE DOE.(kw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 E-mail attachment
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
27 27 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 07/15 11:37 AM
ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by DEFT JANE DOE.(kw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 E-Mail Letter,
Att: 2 Appointments,
Att: 3 email 1,
Att: 4 email 2,
Att: 5 email 3,
Att: 6 email 4,
Att: 7 email 5,
Att: 8 email 6,
Att: 9 email 7,
Att: 10 email 8,
Att: 11 email 9,
Att: 12 E-mail Attachment
26 26 motion Certify Thu 07/15 11:07 AM
MOTION TO CERTIFY ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S FRCP 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPELLATE REVIEW PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292(b), Memorandum, filed by DEFT JANE DOE.(kw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 E-mail attachment
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
25 25 2 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 06/30 4:14 PM
ORDER THAT THE UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STRIKE AND ALLOW DEFENDANT TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/30/21. 6/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
24 24 14 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Wed 06/30 4:10 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/30/21. 6/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
misc Remark Thu 06/24 9:25 AM
ORDER23 MAILED TO UNREP. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
23 23 1 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Wed 06/23 4:29 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AN ANSWER BY 7/14/2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/23/21. 6/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
22 22 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 06/22 11:18 AM
Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendant Jamie Roe's Motion to Dismiss filed by JAMIE ROE.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email attachment
Monday, June 14, 2021
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/14 1:47 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC, KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS. (ROGERS, LANCE)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
20 20 motion Strike Mon 06/07 9:39 AM
JAMIE ROE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STRIKE AND TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY, MEMORANDUM.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Emailed attachment
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
19 19 motion Dismiss Tue 06/01 10:51 AM
JAMIE ROE'S MOTION TO DISMISS, MEMORANDUM.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email attachment
Monday, May 10, 2021
18 18 service Certificate of Service Mon 05/10 11:26 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC, KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS re17 Letter,, (HEFFERN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
17 17 misc Letter Wed 05/05 2:37 PM
Letter from Judge Kenney addressed to counsel dated 5/5/21. A review of the Courts records shows that a pleading has not been filed in the above-captioned action in response to the complaint. If such a pleading is not filed by Defendant Jamie Miller on or before May 31, 2021, you may file a request with the clerk for entry of default in accordance with Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If the Request for Default is not filed by June 7, 2021, the Court may enter an order dismissing the case against Defendant Jamie Miller for lack of prosecution. Plaintiffs counsel shall promptly serve a copy of this letter upon Jamie Miller and file proof of same on ECF on or before May 12, 2021. (mbh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
16 16 misc Letter Tue 04/20 12:16 PM
Letter dated 3/28/21 by JAMIE MILLER(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email attachment,
Att: 2 USPS receipt 1,
Att: 3 USPS receipt 2,
Att: 4 USPS tracking 1,
Att: 5 USPS tracking 2,
Att: 6 Envelope
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
15 15 service Certificate of Service Tue 03/30 4:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC, KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS re14 Affidavit of Service (HEFFERN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Tue 03/30 3:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Roger Padilla - Undisputed Legal, Inc. re: served Summons and Amended Complaint upon Jamie Miller by Posting premises and USPS regular first class mail on 03/26/2021 (HEFFERN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 03/18 10:37 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL SERVE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT MILLER WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM TODAY'S DATE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MAY FORMALLY COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS BY POSTING A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ON THE FRONT DOOR OF SAID RESIDENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/17/21.3/18/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
misc Remark Thu 03/18 10:53 AM
COPY OF ORDER13 MAILED TO MILLER. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 03/17 1:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit of Service of Complaint filed by DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC, KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(HEFFERN, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, December 04, 2020
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/04 2:15 PM
First Amended Complaint against JOHN DOE 1 and JAMIE MILLER filed by DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC d/b/a RUMER COSMETIC SURGERY and KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 12/04 1:18 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/4/20.12/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 12/04 2:19 PM
Summons Issued as to JAMIE MILLER. E-mailed to counsel on 12/4/20 (mbh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
9 9 motion Leave to File Document Wed 12/02 10:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC, KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS.Certificate of Counsel.(ROGERS, LANCE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/19 11:15 AM
NOTICE: GIVEN THAT THIS CASE WAS FILED ON 1/23/20, THAT THE CASE HAS HAD ONLY DOE DEFENDANTS SINCE ITS INCEPTION, THAT THE COURT HAS TWICE GIVEN EXTENSIVE TIME TO INVESTIGATE, AND THAT, IN RESPONSE TO THE LAST SHOW CAUSE ORDER, PLAINTIFF ACKNOWLEDGED THAT IT HAS IDENTIFIED THE PRIMARY DEFENDANT, IT IS THEREFORE NOTICED THAT IF A PARTY THAT HAS DIVERSITY OF CITIZENSHIP FROM PLAINTIFF IS NOT SUBSTITUTED WITHIN 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS NOTICE, THE CASE WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
7 7 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 11/17 3:01 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE ON OR BEFORE 11/24/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/17/20. 11/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
6 6 misc Status Report Fri 07/31 2:23 PM
STATUS REPORT by DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC, KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS. (ROGERS, LANCE)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 07/21 9:35 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL SHOW CAUSE VIA ECF FILING ON OR BEFORE 7/31/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/20/20. 7/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
4 4 misc Status Report Fri 05/29 10:21 AM
STATUS REPORT by DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC, KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS. (ROGERS, LANCE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/21 10:32 AM
NOTICE THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A STATUS REPORT ON ECF THAT SPECIFICALLY DETAILS THE STEPS PLAINTIFF HAS TAKEN TO IDENTIFY THE DEFENDANTS AND THEIR RESPECTIVE CITIZENSHIP ON OR BEFORE 5/29/20. THE REPORT SHALL INCLUDE A TIMELINE OF PLAINTIFF'S ACTION UP TO AND THROUGH 5/21/20.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2020
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LANCE ROGERS on behalf of DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC, KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS (ROGERS, LANCE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/28 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT against JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE210341.), filed by KATHY RUMER, DO, FACOS, DELAWARE VALLEY AESTHETICS, PLLC.(bw, )
Related: [-]