COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA et al v. FERRIERO
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Rudolph Contreras |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00242 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 28, 2020 4:41 AM EDT |
Amicus
AMALGAMATED BANK
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STEVE BULLOCK
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
ERWIN CHEMERINSKY
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA University Park
Los Angeles, CA 90089 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MASSACHUSETTS One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
1350 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
GENERATION RATIFY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
GOOGLE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
GOVERNOR OF KANSAS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
REVA SIEGEL
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF COLORADO
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF CONNECTICUT
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF DELAWARE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF HAWAII
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF MAINE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF MARYLAND
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF MICHIGAN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF MINNESOTA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF NEW JERSEY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF NEW MEXICO
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF NEW YORK
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF OREGON
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF VERMONT
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF WASHINGTON
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF WISCONSIN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
JULIE C. SUK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVID S. FERRIERO
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
ALABAMA
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
LOUISIANA
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
NEBRASKA
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
SOUTH DAKOTA
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
TENNESSEE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
1010DATA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
98POINT6 INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AAUW OF ILLINOIS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AAUW OF NEVADA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AAUW OF RICHMOND
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AAUW OF VIRGINIA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AIRBNB, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ALICE PAUL INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
APPLE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ARAB WOMEN ORGANIZATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ARIZONA NOW
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ASANA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ATAKAMA INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BIOGEN INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BLACK WOMENS ROUNDTABLE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BLOOMBERG L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BOWERY FARMING INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BRAZE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CALIFORNIA CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CAPESPACE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CENTER FOR COMMON GROUND
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CHICAGO FOUNDATION FOR WOMEN
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CHOBANI, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CITIGROUP INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CLARE BOOTHE LUCE CENTER FOR CONSERVATIVE WOMEN
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CONCERNED WOMEN FOR AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
|
Represented By
|
Movant
COTA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LAROCK DAVID
|
Represented By
|
Movant
DAYFORWARD INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LEANNE LITTRELL DILORENZO
|
Represented By
|
Movant
DOLORES HUERTA FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE LEGAL EMPOWERMENT AND APPEALS PROJECT
|
Represented By
|
Movant
DOWNTOWN WOMEN FOR CHANGE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EAGLE FORUM
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EAGLE FORUM FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ELLIG GROUP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EQUAL MEANS ERA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EQUAL RIGHTS AMENDMENT NORTH CAROLINA ALLIANCE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EQUAL RIGHTS TRUST
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EQUALITY NOW
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EQUALITY UTAH
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EQUITABLE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ERA COALITION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ERA MINNESOTA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ERA TASK FORCE AZ
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ETSY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EUROPEAN WOMEN'S LOBBY
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NOAH FELDMAN
|
Represented By
|
Movant
FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
FEMNET
|
Represented By
|
Movant
FUND FOR WOMEN'S EQUALITY
|
Represented By
|
Movant
GENDER JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
GENERAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S CLUBS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
GENERATION UPWARDS
|
|
Movant
GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
HADASSAH, THE WOMEN'S ZIONIST ORGANIZATION OF AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
HERSHEY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Movant
HOMEGIRL PROJECT
|
|
Movant
ILLINOIS FEDERATION OF WOMENS BUSINESS CLUBS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ILLINOIS NOW
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
|
|
Movant
INDUSTRIOUS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
INTERNATIONAL WOMEN'S RIGHTS ACTION WATCH ASIA PACIFIC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
JUSTICE REVIVAL
|
Represented By
|
Movant
KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
KIND LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LARATIFYERA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LATIN AMERICAN AND CARIBBEAN COMMITTEE FOR THE DEFENSE OF WOMEN'S RIGHTS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF VIRGINIA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LEGAL MOMENTUM
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LEVI STRAUSS & CO.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LIVARI CLOTHING
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LYFT, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ROBERT G. MARSHALL
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MASTERCARD INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MCINTOSH FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MICHIGAN ERAMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MICHIGAN FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MICROSOFT
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MORGAN STANLEY
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MORMONS FOR ERA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MOTUS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NARDELLO & CO.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COMMISSIONS FOR WOMEN
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN LAWYERS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL CONGRESS OF BLACK WOMEN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL IMMIGRANT WOMEN'S ADVOCACY PROJECT, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NATIONAL WOMENS POLITICAL CAUCUS OF VIRGINIA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NEUBERGER BERMAN
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NEVADA NOW
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NEVADANS FOR THE ERA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Movant
OKLAHOMA WOMEN'S COALITION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
OSCAR HEALTH
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PEPSICO, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PFIZER INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PLANET LABS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PLATFORM
|
|
Movant
POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PRIDE IN RUNNING
|
|
Movant
PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PROJECT 28 MO
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PUPPET, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
RACHELS NETWORK
|
Represented By
|
Movant
REBELLE MEDIA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
RESTORING LIBERTY ACTION COMMITTEE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
RETHINKING EVE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
RODAN & FIELDS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SALESFORCE.COM, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SEED&SPARK, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SENDING HER ESSENTIALS
|
|
Movant
SERVICE WOMEN'S ACTION NETWORK
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SHUTTERSTOCK, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
REVA SIEGEL
|
|
Movant
SISTERHOOD IS GLOBAL INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SISTERS OF LORETTO - LORETTO COMMUNITY
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SISTERS OF ST. JOSEPH OF CARONDELET AREA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SPOTIFY USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
STRAVA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SURVEYMONKEY INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST
|
Represented By
|
Movant
THINX
|
Represented By
|
Movant
TIFFANY & CO.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
TIME'S UP FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
TORY BURCH LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
TRANSUNION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
TURNITIN, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
TURO INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
TWITTER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
U.S. CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
|
Represented By
|
Movant
UBER
|
Represented By
|
Movant
UNION THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK
|
Represented By
|
Movant
UNITED 4 EQUALITY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
UTAH ERA COALITION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
VARATIFYERA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
VF CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
VICE MEDIA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
VIRGINIA NOW
|
Represented By
|
Movant
VIRGINIA POOR PEOPLES CAMPAIGN
|
Represented By
|
Movant
VOTEERA.ORG
|
Represented By
|
Movant
VOTO LATINO
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WEWORK
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WOMEN LAWYERS ON GUARD INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WOMEN MATTER
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WOMEN'S EQUALITY COALITION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WOMEN'S HEALTH AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WOMEN'S MEDIA CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WOMENS BAR ASSOCIATION OF ILLINOIS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WORKDAY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WORLD POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Movant
YWCA METROPOLITAN CHICAGO
|
Represented By
|
Movant
YWCA USA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF ILLINOIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF NEVADA
|
Represented By
|
1. | Herring, other state AGs file lawsuit demanding addition of Equal Rights Amendment to Constitution (washingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Thu 01/30/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
122 | 122
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 04/25 1:42 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to119 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,, filed by STATES OF ILLINOIS, CALIFORNIA, COLORADO, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, HAWAII, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEW JERSEY, NEW YORK, NORTH CAROLINA, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, AND WASHINGTON, STATE OF NEVADA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA ; USCA Case Number 21-5096 (znmw) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Judgment 2/28/2023 |