Johnson et al v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Mcshane |
Case #: | 6:20-cv-00190 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Marion County Circuit Court, 20CV01249 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 01, 2020 5:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristine Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe J.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe K.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe S.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - Terminate Case
Fri 08/14 12:28 PM
JUDGMENT: Based on the record, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 8/14/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Wed 07/22 9:36 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brandt, William) |
|
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
Wed 06/10 4:10 PM
ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines14 . Discovery is to be completed by 9/1/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/5/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
Tue 06/02 12:48 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brandt, William) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
resp
Reply to Motion
Thu 03/19 11:50 AM
Reply in support to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 5 . Filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. (Morales, Nathan) |
|
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
7
pgs
resp
Memorandum in Opposition
Mon 03/09 2:03 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 5 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brandt, William) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Wed 03/04 12:05 PM
ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim5 . Response is due by 3/9/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Mon 03/02 1:52 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 5 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brandt, William) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerks Notice of Pay.gov Refund
Wed 02/19 10:03 AM
Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6221990. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to PC Por E-File Related Doc6 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically,. (lp) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Thu 02/13 11:40 AM
ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim5 . Response is due by 3/2/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Mon 02/10 4:41 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 5 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brandt, William) |
|
6 | 6
refund
Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically
Mon 02/10 10:57 AM
Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 4 . Filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. (Morales, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment | ||
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 02/07 4:06 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. (Morales, Nathan) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Refund Request Due
Wed 02/05 7:27 AM
A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit[LINK:Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees] on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 2/18/2020. (ljp) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Tue 02/04 5:26 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 7/6/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd) |
|
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/03 3:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. (Morales, Nathan) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 02/03 3:46 PM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 20cv01249 from Marion County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-6221990 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Successors. (Morales, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment |