Soule et al v. Connecticut Association of Schools, Inc. et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Robert N Chatigny |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-00201 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 12, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Jan 24, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 10, 2020 5:05 AM EDT |
Amicus
United States
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Canton Public Schools Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Connecticut Association of Schools, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cromwell Public Schools Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Danbury Public Schools Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Glastonbury Public Schools Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bloomfield Public Schools Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
U.S. Department of Education Office for Civil Rights
U.S. Department of Education 400 Maryland Ave., S.W.
Washington, D.C., DC 20202 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
U.S. Department of Education
400 Maryland Avenue, S.W.
Washington, D.C., DC 20202 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Betsy DeVos
U.S. Department of Education 400 Maryland Ave., S.W.
Washington, D.C., DC 20202 |
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Andraya Yearwood
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Thania Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities
450 Columbus Boulevard Suite 2
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Nicoletti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Selina Soule
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alanna Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chelsea Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 25 2021
ORDER granting 145 Motion to Dismiss. See attached ruling and order for details. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/25/2021. (Price, N.) |
1. | Conn. high school girls file federal suit to prevent transgender athletes from competing (washingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/13/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 04/18 11:39 AM
ORDER granting214 Consent Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Memorandum. Plaintiffs may file a combined memorandum in opposition to Defendants' and Intervenor-Defendants' respective motions to dismiss of up to 60 pages inlength. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/18/2024. (Rickevicius, L.) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
214 | 214
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 04/17 3:49 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Memorandum with Altered Page Count by Chelsea Mitchell, Ashley Nicoletti, Alanna Smith, Selina Soule. (Brooks, Roger) |
|
212 | 212
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 11:19 AM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Cody S. Barnett to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7725754) by Chelsea Mitchell, Ashley Nicoletti, Alanna Smith, Selina Soule. (Fox, Susan) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 12:11 PM
ORDER granting212 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Cody S. Barnett. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6 16-2024 . Signed by Clerk on 4 17-2024 (Shafer, J.) |