Doscher v. Trupp
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Benjamin H Settle |
Case #: | 3:12-cv-05327 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2012 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2012 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2016 11:06 AM PST |
Defendant
Martha Trupp
|
|
Plaintiff
Christian Doscher
PO BOX 1803
LACEY, WA 98509 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, May 31, 2012 | ||
***Civil Case Terminated. (TG) | ||
Wednesday, May 30, 2012 | ||
7 | 7 1 pgs PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Settlement . (Doscher, Christian) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE: Registered Pro Se plaintiff Christian Doscher for electronic filing and notification. See attached registration form. (KN) | |
Monday, May 07, 2012 | ||
Summons Issued as to defendant Martha Trupp; and mailed back to plaintiff for service (CMG) | ||
Tuesday, May 01, 2012 | ||
5 | 5 15 pgs COMPLAINT against defendant Martha Trupp filed by Christian Doscher.(TG) | |
4 | 4 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(TG; cc mailed to plaintiff) | |
Thursday, April 26, 2012 | ||
3 | 3 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H Settle for all further proceedings by William M. McCool. (KAM) | |
MOTION REFERRED: re1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christian Doscher (KAM) | ||
Wednesday, April 25, 2012 | ||
MOTION(S) REFERRED: re1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christian Doscher (JL) | ||
Tuesday, April 24, 2012 | ||
2 | 2 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J Richard Creatura for all further proceedings. Judge Robert J. Bryan no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall bear cause number C12-5327JRC. Entered as directed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (DK) | |
Tuesday, April 17, 2012 | ||
1 | 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Christian Doscher.(DK) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Complaint |