Stratford University, Inc. v. Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Liam O'Grady |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00240 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 30, 2020 4:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stratford University, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/27 4:05 PM
ORDER that the above-captioned action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the matter is concluded. The clerk of this Court is directed to remove the Action from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/27/20. (klau, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/26 11:14 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Stratford University, Inc.. (Obuchowicz, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 05/06 8:56 AM
Notice of Correction re20 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings The filing user has been notified that memorandum in support and notice of waiver should be filed separate for future filing. (klau, ) |
||
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 05/06 9:00 AM
ORDER granting20 Joint Motion to Stay. All deadlines are hereby stayed. The parties will file status updates informing the Court the hearing process before the Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools. The first status update will be filed 30 days after the date of Stratford University's hearing before ACICS ------ (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/5/20. (klau, ) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Stay
Tue 05/05 4:24 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Stratford University, Inc..(Obuchowicz, David) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument | ||
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/14 4:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stratford University, Inc.. Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools waiver sent on 3/13/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Obuchowicz, David) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Bond
Thu 03/12 5:21 PM
Preliminary Injunction BOND in the amount of $1,500.00 posted by Stratford University, Inc. (klau, ) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Transcript
Thu 03/12 9:16 AM
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/9/2020, before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2020.(thomson, anneliese) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Wed 03/11 4:53 PM
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION that Stratford's Emergency Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, [Dkt.14] and [Dkt.3], are hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that defendant, its officers, agents, servants, representatives, employees, and any other person acting in concert or otherwise participating in its aid, be and are enjoined, restrained, and prevented from ordering a cessation of enrollment at the University until defendant has held the March 31, 2020 hearing and made a final determination as to plaintiff's accreditation status ----- ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this preliminary injunction will expire upon defendant's post-hearing determination of plaintiff's accreditation status if that determination is affirmed on appeal by the Review Board. Plaintiff is required to provide a bond of $1,500.00 in support of this preliminary injunction (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 3/11/20. (klau, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
respoth
Opposition
Tue 03/10 2:05 PM
Opposition to14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools.(Gartner, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction
Tue 03/10 11:02 AM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Stratford University, Inc..(Obuchowicz, David) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit | ||
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/09 4:26 PM
ORDER - Because of the extensive overlap of issues between the two civil actions, both should be considered by the same judge. Following the court's practice of assigning related civil actions to the judge who is randomly assigned the earlier action, it is hereby ORDERED that this civil action be and is reassigned to Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/9/2020. (dvanm, ) |
|
12 | 12
5
pgs
respoth
Objection
Mon 03/09 3:34 PM
Objection to Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order filed by Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools. (Gartner, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 03/09 10:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 3/9/2020. Appearances of counsel. Court advised of case status.3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/09 4:30 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff no longer assigned to the case. (dvanm, ) |
||
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 03/06 3:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Stratford University, Inc..(Obuchowicz, David) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit Ex. 1 | ||
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/05 1:53 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools. (Gartner, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
19
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Thu 03/05 1:51 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools.(Gartner, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (1 of 2), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 (2 of 2), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/05 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Curtis Gartner on behalf of Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools (Gartner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/04 5:24 PM
ORDER re3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , A hearing on this motion is currently scheduled for Friday, March 6, 2020 at 10:00 am. To ensure that this motion is fully briefed before a hearing is held. ORDERED that defense counsel file any opposition to the motion by Thursday, March 5, 2020. ORDERED that the hearing be and is RESCHEDULED until Monday, March 9, 2020 at 10:00 am. Because defense counsel has not yet appeared in this action, it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's counsel ensure that defense counsel receives a copy of this Order. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/4/20. (klau, ) |
|
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/04 9:43 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, ) |
||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/04 5:27 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (klau, ) |
||
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Tue 03/03 6:26 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order(Obuchowicz, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order | ||
4 | 4
21
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Tue 03/03 6:21 PM
Memorandum in Support re3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Stratford University, Inc.. (Obuchowicz, David) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 03/03 6:20 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Stratford University, Inc.. (Obuchowicz, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/03 6:18 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Stratford University, Inc.. (Obuchowicz, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/03 6:14 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7102880.), filed by Stratford University, Inc..(Obuchowicz, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 |