Cohan v. Diplomat Properties, LP
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia G Cooke |
Referred: | Edwin G Torres |
Case #: | 0:14-cv-60895 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2014 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 13, 2014 5:15 AM EST |
Defendant
Diplomat Properties, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, July 31, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Howard Cohan Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/31/2014. (tm) | |
Wednesday, July 30, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Howard Cohan (Cohen, Mark) | |
Monday, June 30, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 Order Administratively Closing Case Upon Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/30/2014. (tm) | |
Thursday, June 05, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Settlement by Howard Cohan (Cohen, Mark) | |
Tuesday, May 20, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to Administrative Order 2014-48 to Judge Marcia G. Cooke and Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all further proceedings. Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum, Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt no longer assigned to case (vp) | |
Tuesday, May 13, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 Statement of: Counsel Regarding Prior Filings Under The ADA by Howard Cohan re6 Order (Cohen, Mark) | |
Tuesday, May 06, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Diplomat Properties, LP's response to the Complaint is now due by 6/6/2014. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 5/6/2014. (kms) | |
10 | 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re1 Complaint by Diplomat Properties, LP.(Sohrn, Shuman) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Striking8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re1 Complaint filed by Diplomat Properties, LP by Diplomat Properties, LP (Sohrn, Shuman) | |
8 | 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re1 Complaint by Diplomat Properties, LP. Attorney Shuman Sohrn added to party Diplomat Properties, LP(pty:dft).(Sohrn, Shuman) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consented to Motion for Extension | ||
Wednesday, April 23, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. See Attached Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 4/23/2014. (sl00) | |
Tuesday, April 22, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER requiring certificate of counsel regarding prior ADA filings. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/22/2014. (kms) | |
5 | 5 ORDER REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/22/2014. (kms) | |
Monday, April 21, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Howard Cohan. DIPLOMAT PROPERTIES, LP served on 4/16/2014, answer due 5/7/2014. (Cohen, Mark) | |
Tuesday, April 15, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to DIPLOMAT PROPERTIES, LP. (ail) | |
2 | 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum (ail) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against DIPLOMAT PROPERTIES, LP. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6655821, filed by Howard Cohan.(Cohen, Mark) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |