ALTERS et al v. PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Aileen M Cannon |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-21108 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2022 |
Case in other court: | 20-13766-F |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 08, 2020 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
HUBEI HEALTH COMMISSION
|
|
Defendant
NATIONAL HEALTH COMMISSION OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
|
|
Defendant
PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
|
|
Defendant
WUHAN INSTITUTE OF VIROLOGY, CHINESE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES
|
|
Defendant
THE PEOPLE'S GOVERNMENT OF CITY OF WUHAN, CHINA
|
|
Defendant
WUHAN HEALTH COMMISSION
|
|
Defendant
THE PEOPLE'S GOVERNMENT OF HUBEI PROVINCE
|
|
Defendant
COMMUNIST PARTY OF CHINA
|
|
Interested Party
David Andrew Christenson
Box 9063
Miramar Beach, FL 32550 |
|
Movant
Paul Camarena
500 So. Clinton, No.132
Chicago, IL 60607 |
|
Plaintiff
SAMSON TOURS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BILL MCCUTCHEON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSICA MERRITT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF JAMES A MITCHELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER MITCHELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JUDY HART
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mr. M's Sandwich Shop, Inc., FL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DR. ANDREW NEWMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEORGE ROGOZINSKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN VECCHIARELLO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SB HOLDINGS I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SEAGRASS RESORT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT SHAFFER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHERRY WERNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SOUTH FLORIDA SURFING CORP. d/b/a ISLAND WATER SPORTS MIAMI, FL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KARL UMBACH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRYAN EADS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHEN CLYNE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARTA REYES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LAWRENCE WOOD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THE PITCHING LAB LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAUNDRA ANDRINGA-MEUER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RAY BODINE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LORRAINE CAGGIANO MAIORINO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM DAMELIO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TODD KUNTZE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EAST AIR CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KIMBERLY ELLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GALLERY ART GROUP, INC., FL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Constance Greene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LINDA IGLESIAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT JARVIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JUPITER DONUTS, FL
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
MINISTRY OF CIVIL AFFAIRS OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
Terminated: 05/07/2020
|
|
Defendant
MINISTRY OF EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
Terminated: 05/07/2020
|
|
Plaintiff
LOGAN ALTERS
Terminated: 03/16/2020
on behalf of themselves, and all those similarly situated 277 OCEAN BOULEVARD
GOLDEN BEACH, FL 33160 |
Represented By
|
1. | Boca Raton law firm sues Chinese government over handling of coronavirus (cbs12.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/16/2020 | |