News Group Newspapers Limited v. Lauran Divenere et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:20-mc-00027 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 27, 2020 8:05 AM PDT |
Petitioner
News Group Newspapers Limited
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Dan Wootton
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Laura Divenere
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Tyler Hadden
|
|
Respondent
Melissa Saenz
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 11/03 1:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: These proceedings began in March 2020 when Petitioners filed an Application for Order Compelling Testimony in Foreign Proceeding under 28 U.S.C. 1782. (ECF No. 1.) On March 27, 2020, the Court issued an Order compelling the Respondents in this matter to sit fora London-based trial remotely using a satellite connection from here in Los Angeles17 . There being no further controversy and no further relief to (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 03/31 3:29 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Walter Thompson counsel for Respondent Laura Divenere. Robert W. Thompson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Laura Divenere. (Thompson, Robert) |
|
18 | 18
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 03/31 10:11 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by petitioners News Group Newspapers Limited, Dan Wootton, re Order,,17 served on March 31, 2020. (Rufus-Isaacs, Alexander) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
5
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/27 4:12 PM
ORDER COMPELLING RESPONDENTS LAURA DIVENERE, MELISSA SAENZ AND TYLER HADDEN TO PROVIDE TESTIMONY IN FOREIGN PROCEEDING UNDER U.S.C. 1782 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Respondants shall appear at the Beverly Hills Bar Association located at 9420 Wilshire Blvd., 2nd Floor, Beverly Hills, CA 90212, to testify via live satellite video link directly into the courtroom in London where the trial of the English Action will be held, commencing at 7:00 am PST, on a date during said trial.( SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS THEREIN ). (lc) |
|
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 03/25 1:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:The Court has been advised that Counsel for Petitioner, News Group Newspapers, Ltd has made an emergencyex parte application to continue the hearing on this matter by emailing the clerk. It appears that counsels wife has been rushed to the hospital, having apparently contracted COVID19. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILED DISCUSSION AND RULING THEREIN).The Court has carefully considered the Opposition and finds the reasons set forth in the Opposition insufficient for the Court to disturb its original order, which will remain in effect, with one modification. IT IS ORDERED, Counsel for Petitioner shall resubmit the Order correcting the date upon which the three witnesses are to present themselves to the Beverly Hills Bar Association Offices in Beverly Hills for the purpose of providing testimony in the Depp trial. Until a new trial date is set, it is impossible to specify an appearance date in the Order other than in the most general terms. Once the new trial date is set, Petitioner shall immediately advise Ms. Divenere through her counsel, of the new date. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/24 5:29 PM
OPPOSITION RESPONDENT'S OBJECTION TO PETITIONERS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING TESTIMONY IN FOREIGN PROCEEDING filed by Respondent Laura Divenere. (Attorney Lee A Sherman added to party Laura Divenere(pty:res))(Sherman, Lee) |
|
14 | 14
5
pgs
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Tue 03/24 4:38 PM
REPLY in support of application FOR ORDER COMPELLING TESTIMONY IN FOREIGN PROCEEDING UNDER 28 USC 1782 filed by Petitioners News Group Newspapers Limited, Dan Wootton. (Rufus-Isaacs, Alexander) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 03/20 7:57 PM
OPPOSITION to Petitioner's Application for an Order Compelling Testimony in Foreign Proceeding filed by Respondent Laura Divenere.(Attorney Robert Walter Thompson added to party Laura Divenere(pty:res))(Thompson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 9 pgs Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Declaration Declaration of Laura Divenere | ||
12 | 12
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/20 10:43 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by petitioners News Group Newspapers Limited, Dan Wootton, re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 on Responent Laura Divenere's Counsel by Messenger served on March 19, 2020. (Rufus-Isaacs, Alexander) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/19 5:18 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by petitioners News Group Newspapers Limited, Dan Wootton, re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 on Responent Laura Divenere and her Counsel by Email served on March 19, 2020. (Rufus-Isaacs, Alexander) |
|
10 | 10
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/19 5:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by petitioners News Group Newspapers Limited, Dan Wootton, re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 on Respondents Saenz and Hadden served on March 19, 2020. (Rufus-Isaacs, Alexander) |
|
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 03/19 4:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Re March 18, 2020 Order by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. The Court hereby vacates its March 18, 2020 order8 . (sbou) |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/18 2:04 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: Application for Order Compelling Testimony of Laura Divenere, Melissa Saenz, and Tyler Hadden in Foreign Proceeding Under 28 U.S.C. § 1782 by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: The Court orders the following: 1. Petitioners shall by March 19, 2020, serve this minute order and the Application and supporting documents on all interested parties. 2. Ms. Divenere, Officer Melissa Saenz, and Officer Tyler Hadden may file oppositions by March 20, 2020 (but are not required to). 3. The Court will hold a telephonic conference on March 23, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. At that time, anyone who wants to be heard on Petitioners' Application may participate in the hearing (even if they have not filed an opposition/brief).: Call-in Number: (213) 894-0800. Meeting ID: 1112 #, User Password: 3674 #. (es) |
|
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/18 8:59 AM
ORDER COMPELLING LAURA DIVENERE, MELISSA SAENZ AND TYLER HADDEN TO PROVIDE TESTIMONY IN FOREIGN PROCEEDING UNDER U.S.C. 1782 ON MARCH 27,2020 (SEE DOCUMENT FOR LOCATION AND TIME AND OTHER SPECIFIC DETAILS )1 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Transferring Reference/Discovery purs LR 83-1.3.1 (Related Case)(CV-34a)
Wed 03/18 11:17 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 19-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-mc-00020 UA(PJWx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 2:20-mc-00027 ODW(PJWx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (rn) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/17 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Mon 03/16 3:32 PM
List of Exhibits filed by Petitioner News Group Newspapers Limited re: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 (Rufus-Isaacs, Alexander) |
|
3 | 3
8
pgs
misc
For Judicial Notice
Mon 03/16 3:13 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Petitioner News Group Newspapers Limited. (Rufus-Isaacs, Alexander) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/16 3:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Petitioner News Group Newspapers Limited identifying News Corp UK & Ireland Limited as Corporate Parent. (Rufus-Isaacs, Alexander) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/16 3:00 PM
APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING TESTIMONY IN FOREIGN PROCEEDING UNDER 28 USC 1782 Receipt No: ACACDC-25747260 - Fee: $400, filed by petitioners News Group Newspapers Limited. (Attorney Alexander Rufus-Isaacs added to party News Group Newspapers Limited(pty:pet))(Rufus-Isaacs, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 9 pgs Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 4 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 13 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 14 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 17 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 3 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 6 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 3 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 14 2 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 15 8 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 16 3 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 17 3 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 18 50 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 19 23 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 20 3 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 21 3 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 22 2 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 23 2 pgs Exhibit |