New York Southern District Court
Judge:William H Pauley, III
Case #: 1:14-cv-02703
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2014
Re-opened:Jun 05, 2017
Terminated:Dec 03, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 4:15 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Aubrey Drake Graham
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Movit
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
John Matthew Deweese Williams
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp L.L.P.(dc)
contact info
Counter Defendant
Stephen Hacker
Counter Defendant
Hebrew Hustle Inc.
Represented By
Anthony Robert Motta
Anthony Motta, Esq.,
contact info
Defendant
Amazon Digital Services, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Movit
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
Christine Lepera
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
John Matthew Deweese Williams
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp L.L.P.(dc)
contact info
Defendant
Apple, Inc.
Represented By
Gabrielle Frances Levin
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Cash Money Records, Inc.
Represented By
Cynthia S. Arato
Shapiro Arato LLP
contact info
Defendant
EMI Music Publishing Management, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Movit
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
Christine Lepera
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
David John Przygoda
Sony Corporation Of America
contact info
John Matthew Deweese Williams
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp L.L.P.(dc)
contact info
Defendant
Jordan Evans
Defendant
Aubrey Drake Graham
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Movit
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
John Matthew Deweese Williams
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp L.L.P.(dc)
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Jehu Samuels
Defendant
Sony/ATV Music Publishing, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Movit
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
Christine Lepera
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
David John Przygoda
Sony Corporation Of America
contact info
John Matthew Deweese Williams
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp L.L.P.(dc)
contact info
Defendant
Universal Music Group Distribution, Corp.
Represented By
Cynthia S. Arato
Shapiro Arato LLP
contact info
Defendant
Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC
Represented By
Cynthia S. Arato
Shapiro Arato LLP
contact info
Defendant
Universal Republic Records
Represented By
Cynthia S. Arato
Shapiro Arato LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Movit
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
Christine Lepera
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp (ny)
contact info
Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Oppenheim + Zebrak, LLP
contact info
John Matthew Deweese Williams
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp L.L.P.(dc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of James Oscar Smith
Represented By
Anthony Robert Motta
Anthony Motta, Esq.,
contact info
Plaintiff
Hebrew Hustle Inc.
Represented By
Anthony Robert Motta
Anthony Motta, Esq.,
contact info

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, December 03, 2018
288 288 5 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 5:07 PM
CONSENT ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. Defendants are enjoined and restrained permanently from engaging in any use, whether on the www.hebrew-hustle.com website or otherwise, of: (a) Graham's name; and/or (b) Graham's image and/or (c) Graham's likeness. 2. Graham's False Endorsement and Right of Publicity Claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice and with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs incurred with respect to the False Endorsement and Right of Publicity Claims. 3. This Consent Order does not affect the right of Hebrew Hustle and the Estate to appeal the dismissal of their Copyright Claims and Graham's rights to oppose any such appeal on the merits. 4. In any post appeal proceedings on the Copyright Claims, the parties' respective rights are fully reserved. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/3/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 02, 2018
287 287 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Sun 1:55 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 30, 2018
286 286 misc Letter Fri 4:56 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Anthony Motta dated 11/30/2018 re: Counterclaim Defendants' request to exclude Counterclaim Plaintiff for seeking damages for emotional distress and statutory damages pursuant to Ca. Civ. Code Sec 3344. Document filed by Stephen Hacker, Hebrew Hustle Inc..(Motta, Anthony)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Final Mon 3:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/30/2018. (DiMarino, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
285 285 misc Letter Thu 1:11 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Anthony Motta dated 11/29/2018 re: List of papers on Counterclaim Defendants' Motions in Limine No. 1 and 2 pursuant to Individual Practice Rule III(F). Document filed by Stephen Hacker, Hebrew Hustle Inc..(Motta, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
284 284 trial Request to Charge Wed 11:34 PM
REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham.(Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
283 283 misc Pretrial Memorandum Wed 11:14 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham.(Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
282 282 trial Proposed Voir Dire Questions Wed 10:57 PM
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham.(Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
281 281 misc Letter Wed 10:46 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Christine Lepera dated November 28, 2018 re: Enclosing Counterclaim Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form. Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham.(Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Proposed Verdict Form
280 280 misc Letter Wed 4:38 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Christine Lepera dated November 28, 2018 re: Revised Index to In Limine Motions. Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham.(Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
279 279 misc Letter Wed 12:34 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Christine Lepera dated November 28, 2018 re: Index of in limine motions. Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham.(Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
278 278 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 11:20 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:247 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to strike and preclude evidence and argument relating to third and sixth affirmative defense . . Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham.(Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Slip opinion
277 277 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 11:18 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:243 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to preclude evidence or argument concerning unrelated litigations . . Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
276 276 respm Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion Tue 11:18 PM
REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey M. Movit in Support re:243 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to preclude evidence or argument concerning unrelated litigations .. Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham.(Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Email between counsel
275 275 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 11:15 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:241 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to preclude evidence or argument regarding domicile that post-dates conduct giving rise to claims . . Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
274 274 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 11:14 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:238 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to preclude evidence or argument concerning website that Counterclaim Defendants failed to properly preserve . . Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
273 273 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 11:10 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:235 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to preclude undisclosed witnesses and exhibits . . Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
272 272 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 11:08 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:231 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to preclude opinions of rebuttal expert Mark Roesler, Esq. . . Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham. (Lepera, Christine)
Related: [-]
271 271 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 6:33 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:249 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to exclude the testimony of Jonathan Faber . . Document filed by Stephen Hacker, Hebrew Hustle Inc.. (Motta, Anthony)
Related: [-]
270 270 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 6:31 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:228 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to exclude the expert testimony of Dr. Jason King . . Document filed by Stephen Hacker, Hebrew Hustle Inc.. (Motta, Anthony)
Related: [-]
269 269 order Memo Endorsement Tue 12:22 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:268 Letter filed by Aubrey Drake Graham. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed jury instructions should cover only the claims and defenses specific to this case. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/27/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
268 268 misc Letter Tue 9:26 AM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Jeffrey M. Movit dated November 27, 2018 re: Proposed Jury Instructions. Document filed by Aubrey Drake Graham.(Movit, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]