In re: New York City Board of
Original Case: 1:96-cv-08414
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01000 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 09, 2020 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
New York State Education Department
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsa Gulino
|
|
Plaintiff
Mayling Ralph
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Wilds
|
|
Plaintiff
Nia Greene, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Debra Washington
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/09/2020 4:29 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, FILED. [2805547] 20-1000 [Entered: 03/19/2020 12:50 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 960 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/18/2020, RECEIVED.[2805555] 20-1000 [Entered: 03/19/2020 01:04 PM] |