In re: New York City Board of
Original Case: 1:96-cv-08414
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01014 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 30, 2020 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
New York State Education Department
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsa Gulino
|
|
Plaintiff
Mayling Ralph
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Wilds
|
|
Plaintiff
Nia Greene, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Brunilda Juarbe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/30/2020 4:30 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, FILED. [2806395] 20-1014 [Entered: 03/20/2020 01:57 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 957 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/24/2020, RECEIVED.[2806406] 20-1014 [Entered: 03/20/2020 02:01 PM] |